Design Basics LLC v. Campbellsport Building Supply Inc et al

Plaintiff: Design Basics LLC
Defendant: Campbellsport Building Supply Inc, Berlin Building Supply Inc, Kiel Building Supply Inc, Drexel Inc, Drexel Building Supply Inc, Joel M Fleischman and Albert J Fleischman
Case Number: 2:2013cv00560
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2016 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10-4-16 denying 164 Motion in Limine; denying 166 Motion in Limine; denying 168 Motion in Limine; denying 170 Motion in Limine; granting 174 Motion in Limine; denying 176 Motion in Limine; granting 178 Motion in Limine; denying 182 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion in Limine. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 12, 2016 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding spoliation and validity signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9-12-16. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 13, 2016 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding spoliation question signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 7-13-16. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 7, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 6/7/2016 DENYING 128 Plaintiffs Motion for Costs; GRANTING 129 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the eight DMCA infringement claims predating 10/28/1998 which are DISMIS SED, and DENYING Defendants Summary Judgment Motion in all other respects; the Defendants request for dismissal of Plaintiffs claims based on the Colbourne plan is GRANTED; and GRANTING 134 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to the fourth affirmative defense and DENYING it in all other respects. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
September 2, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/2/2015. 82 Defendants' Motion to Compel DENIED. By 9/14/2015 Design Basics must file redacted versions of 106 112 original and supplemental memorandums regarding the motion to compel or a factual statement indicating why they can't be redacted. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 10, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 4/10/2015 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 41 Wilson Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is GRANTED with respect to its lack of a duty to indemnify the Defendant s for any copyright infringement claims arising prior to 3/21/2010 and DENIED with respect to any claims due to copyright infringement between 3/21/2010 & 4/1/2014; GRANTING 62 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Wilson Mutual Insurance C ompany is obligated to indemnify the Defendants for those acts of infringement occurring after 3/21/2010, and to defend the Defendants for all of the infringement claims alleged in the Amended Complaint; DENYING 73 Defendants' 12(c) Motion fo r Partial Judgment on the Pleadings; GRANTING 82 Defendants' Motion to Compel to the extent that no later than 4/30/2015, the Plaintiff must file under seal for the Court's in camera review copies of the 233 documents and any proposed red actions and a brief providing a specific explanation of the legal basis for its withholding of each document. A complete paper copy of those materials must be delivered to the Court; and GRANTING 96 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Brief. (cc: all counsel) (Zik, Linda)
November 10, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/10/2014. 76 Defendants' MOTION to Enlarge Defense Expert Disclosure Dates GRANTED. Scheduling order modified as follows: disclosure of defense expert reports to Design Basics must be made within 21 days of Defendants' receipt of construction drawings for allegedly infringing plans; disclosure of rebuttal expert reports must be made within 21 days of receipt of Defendants' expert reports. 58 Defendants' MOTION for Protective Ord er GRANTED to the extent that interrogatories 2 and 4 of Design Basics' second sent of interrogatories directed to entity defendants are NARROWED to cover the period since 1/1/2001; DENIED in all other respects. 67 Signature's motion to quash third-party subpoena GRANTED with respect to request 1 for plans previously produced and request 4; requests 3 and 5 NARROWED to materials since 1/1/2001; DENIED in all other respects. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 29, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/29/2014. 32 Wilson Mutual's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Complete Response to Written Discovery DENIED; 46 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Wilson Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment GRANTED, Defendants' response due 8/29/2014. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
February 20, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 2/19/2014. 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike/Motion to Compel GRANTED as to Request No. 1 of first request for production of documents and DENIED in all other respects. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T, Randa on 9/17/2013 GRANTING 10 Wilson Mutual's Motion to Intervene. Wilson Mutual to provide the Court with phone number where counsel can be reached for 9/25/2013 telephonic scheduling conference call; parties to confer regarding impact of Wilson Mutual's intervention and, if necessary, file amended joint Rule 26(f) report by 9/24/2013 at noon. (cc: all counsel) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics LLC v. Campbellsport Building Supply Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics LLC
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Represented By: Dana A LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbellsport Building Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlin Building Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiel Building Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drexel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drexel Building Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel M Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?