Ziegler v. Schwochert

Petitioner: Scott Edward Ziegler
Respondent: Jim Schwochert
Case Number: 2:2013cv00609
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Fond du Lac
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/17/2016 DENYING 51 Petitioner's Request to Require Counsel to Craft Petition; DENYING 52 Petitioner's Motion for Discovery and Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; LIFTING the Stay Imposed on 10/16/2015, TERMINATING Attorney Matthew Pinix as attorney for the Petitioner; and Setting a Scheduling Order. Please refer to the order for scheduling details. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to Petitioner) (pwm)
October 16, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/16/2015 GRANTING 43 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration and Appointing Counsel for a Limited Purpose. (cc: all counsel; by hand delivery to Federal Defender Service)(pwm)
October 8, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/8/2015 Screening Complaint and Requiring Response. (cc: all counsel, copy of the order sent to the petitioner by US Mail on October 8, 2015, and copy of the order and petition sent to the Attorney General for the State of Wisconsin, and the Warden of Dodge Correctional Institution by US Mail on October 8, 2015.)(kgw)
July 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/12/13 staying case pending the conclusion of petitioners state-court proceedings. Petitioner must inform the court and respondent every 90 days of the status of his state-court cases. Within 30 days after conclusion of his state-court proceedings, petitioner must notify the court and respondent that they have concluded. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziegler v. Schwochert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Edward Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Schwochert
Represented By: Aaron R O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?