Murphy v. Town of Geneva Wisconsin

Plaintiff: Martin J Murphy
Defendant: Town of Geneva Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2015cv00222
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Walworth
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Finding good cause, the court vacates the dates set in its 28 scheduling order. The court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on October 21, 2015 at 9:30 AM to discuss further scheduling unless the parties file a stipulation of dismissal before that date. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/6/2015. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED plaintiff's 5 motion for preliminary injunction is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED plaintiff's 23 and 24 motions to cite supplemental authorit y are granted. Telephonic Rule 16 conference set for 4/15/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. The parties shall file a report in accordance with Rule 26(f) not later than 4/10/15. See Order for additional details. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the plaintiffs 5 motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. The court withholds ruling on the plaintiffs request for a preliminary injunction pending a hearing before this court on April 2, 20152014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 284 of the United States Courthouse, 517 E. Wisconsin Avenue, Milwaukee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs 18 motion to strike is denied. (cc: all counsel) (asc) Modified on 3/30/2015 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Town of Geneva Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Geneva Wisconsin
Represented By: Charles H Bohl
Represented By: Andrew A Jones
Represented By: Ari Brett Kasper
Represented By: Joseph Mario Mirabella
Represented By: Joseph M Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Murphy
Represented By: Martin J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?