McFarland-Laswson v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Jamesetta McFarland-Lawson
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Julian Castro, Maurice J McGough, Thomas A Nelson, Ann Wright, Cortney Minor, National Employment Group, Charmaine Wood-Williamson, Office of Chief Human Capital Officer Labor and Employee Relations Division Director, Michael Stein, Department of Health and Human Services, Neal Presant and Neil Hibler
Case Number: 2:2016cv00685
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/4/2022 GRANTING 215 Plaintiff's Motion for an Accommodation; the Defendant is to provide Plaintiff with documents in paper format as opposed to email, USB or CD; and GRANTING her reques t for a hearing in lieu of her being required to reply in writing. The Clerk shall schedule an afternoon in-person hearing; counsel for defendant may appear by phone; also GRANTING 216 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time as to 169 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel. She need not reply in writing; the court will schedule a hearing at which she may reply in person. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(lz)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/1/2022 DENYING 170 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING AS MOOT 193 Plaintiff's Motion to Accept her Late Response. The clerks office will contact the parties to set up a telephonic scheduling conference to discuss next steps. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(lz)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/2/2022. The plaintiff McFarland-Lawson's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 183 ) is granted. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendants' motion for summary judgment no later than April 15, 2022. McFarland-Lawson's "2nd Motion for Clarification" (ECF No. 184 ) is denied. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/26/2022. The plaintiff's motion for clarification (ECF No. 179 ) is GRANTED. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/2/2021. The defendant shall look for handwritten notes that Maury McGough took at meetings regarding the plaintiff. If the defendant finds those notes, she will provide them to the plaintiff in hard copy form no later than December 10, 2021. If the defendant does not find those notes, she will notify the plaintiff of their nonexistence no later than December 10, 2021. The plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion for summary judgm ent (ECF No. 170 ) no later than January 10, 2022. In her response, plaintiff should be sure to respond to each of the defendant's proposed findings of fact. (See ECF No. 172 .) Defendant may file a reply no later than January 24, 2022. If the court denies the motion, it will consider plaintiff's September 29, 2021 motion to compel. (ECF No. 169 .) (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/4/2020. The defendant's motion to revoke her in forma pauperis status (ECF No. 140 ) is granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(A). McFarland-Lawson shall pay the $505 docketing and filing fee within 21 days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/26/2020. The court now orders the parties to each file a completed Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form no later than November 5, 2020. (cc: all counsel, plainitff w/magistrate form)(mlm)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/30/2019. The plaintiff Jamesetta McFarland-Lawson's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 132 ) and renewed motion for leave to appeal without prepayment of the filing fee (ECF No. 133 ) are granted. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (mlm)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/10/2017 DENYING 2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDERING the plaintiff to pay the filing fee by 3/10/2017; and DISMISSING defendants. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff) (pwm)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/19/2016 re 1 Complaint - Pro Se filed by Jamesetta McFarland-Lawson. The court ORDERS the plaintiff to file additional documents requested in this order by 1/27/2017. If the plaintiff does not file these documents by the end of the day on 1/27/2017 or ask for more time to do so, the court may dismiss her Complaint. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to Plaintiff)(pwm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland-Laswson v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamesetta McFarland-Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice J McGough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortney Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Employment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charmaine Wood-Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Chief Human Capital Officer Labor and Employee Relations Division Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Presant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Hibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?