Whitaker v. Kenosha Unified School District No 1 Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Ashton Whitaker
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School District No 1 Board of Education and Sue Savaglio-Jarvis
Case Number: 2:2016cv00943
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Kenosha
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/23/2018. 91 Joint motion to approve consent judgment GRANTED. 75 Plaintiff's motion to compel DENIED as moot. 84 Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings DENIED as moot. All pending deadlines VACATED. Clerk's office to close case administratively. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/3/2016 DENYING 44 Rule 7(h) Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 33) Pending Appeal. (cc: all counsel) (pwm)
September 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/24/2016 GRANTING 30 Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7(h) expedited non-dispositive motion to reconsider certification for interlocutory appeal of order denying motion to dismiss and vacating certification. (cc: all counsel) (pwm)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/22/2016 GRANTING IN PART 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The court ORDERS that defendants are ENJOINED from (1) denying plaintiff access to the boys' restrooms; (2) enforcing any policy, written or unwritten, against the plaintiff that would prevent him from using the boys' restroom during any time he is on the school premises or attending school-sponsored events; (3) disciplining plaintiff for using the bo ys' restroom during any time that he is on the school premises or attending school-sponsored events; and (4) monitoring or surveilling in any way plaintiff's restroom use. The court DENIES the defendants' request that the court require the plaintiff to post a bond under Rule 65(c). (cc: all counsel) (pwm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Kenosha Unified School District No 1 Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Whitaker
Represented By: Michael G Allen
Represented By: Sasha J Buchert
Represented By: Shawn Thomas Meerkamper
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Robert Theine Pledl
Represented By: Ilona Turner
Represented By: Joseph J. Wardenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School District No 1 Board of Education
Represented By: Aaron J Graf
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Savaglio-Jarvis
Represented By: Aaron J Graf
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?