Raab v. Wendel et al
Plaintiff: Rudolph Raab
Defendant: Michael C Wendel, West Bend Hospitality Inc, Leo M Sand, Sand Hospitality LLC, Sand Companies Inc and SCI Hotels LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01396
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Waukesha
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 7/10/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the defendants' motion to file a second amended answer (ECF No. 106 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 104 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 114 ) is denied. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/6/2019 granting in part and denying in part 66 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/7/2018.The plaintiffs' motion to exclude Joseph D Kenyon from testifying as an expert (ECF No 72 ) is granted. In light of the defendants' statements that they do not be lieve restriction remains necessary (ECF No 83) and because the defendants filed the report publicly (ECF No 82-1), the plaintiffs' motion (ECF No 71 ) to restrict Joseph D Kenyon's expert report to case participants (ECF No 74-2) is denied. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raab v. Wendel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Raab
Represented By: Shawn M Govern
Represented By: Olivia M Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C Wendel
Represented By: Lisle W Blackbourn
Represented By: Thomas G Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bend Hospitality Inc
Represented By: Lisle W Blackbourn
Represented By: Thomas G Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo M Sand
Represented By: Lisle W Blackbourn
Represented By: Thomas G Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Lisle W Blackbourn
Represented By: Thomas G Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand Companies Inc
Represented By: Lisle W Blackbourn
Represented By: Thomas G Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Hotels LLC
Represented By: Lisle W Blackbourn
Represented By: Thomas G Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?