Jackson v. Racine Correctional Institution et al

Plaintiff: Debradre D Jackson
Defendant: Racine Correctional Institution, Department of Corrections, Sgt Corrao, CO Sairs and A Larson
Case Number: 2:2016cv01454
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Racine
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/9/2018. 19 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment GRANTED. Case DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Debradre Jackson at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/14/2017 GRANTING 17 plaintiff's MOTION to dismiss party. Defendant Ronald Sairs DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Debradre Jackson at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/9/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and SCREENING the complaint. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff and warden at Racine CI) (pwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Racine Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debradre D Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine Correctional Institution
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Corrao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Sairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?