Walker v. Ludvigson et al
Plaintiff: De'Von L Walker
Defendant: Paul Ludvigson, Derek Dekeyser, Randall Gerritson, Kyle K Tritt, K DeYoung, Andrew Moungey, Corey Sabish, Jon Williams, Corey Bradley and Jane and John Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv01485
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/4/2019. 21 Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment GRANTED; defendants Gerritson, Ludvigson, Sabish, Tritt, Williams, Bradley and Dekeyser DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to De'Von Walker at Wisconsin Resource Center)(cb)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/17/2018. 20 Defendants' motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions GRANTED nunc pro tunc to 5/11/2018. 36 Plaintiff's request to have counsel appointed DENIED without prejud ice. Plaintiff's response, if he chooses to file one, to defendants' motion for summary judgment due 2/15/2019; failure to file by deadline may result in dismissal of case for failure to prosecute or ruling on summary judgment motion without plaintiff's input. (cc: all counsel, via mail to De'Von Walker at Wisconsin Resource Center)(cb)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/9/2018. By 8/10/2018 plaintiff to respond to defendants' summary judgment motion or file letter giving reason why he cannot respond. If nothing received by deadline, motion will be decided without input from plaintiff. (cc: all counsel, via mail to De'Von Walker at Wisconsin Resource Center)(cb)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/26/2018. 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery DENIED. Defendants Jane Doe and John Does 1-4 DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to De'Von Walker at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/11/2017 GRANTING 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Wisconsin DOC to collect $345.17 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust account i n accordance with 28 USC §1915(b)(2). Defendants Ludvigson, Dekeyser, Gerritson, Tritt, DeYoung, Moungey, Sabish, Williams and Bradley to file responsive pleading within 60 days. Parties may not begin discovery until the court enters scheduling order setting discovery and dispositive motions deadlines. (cc: all counsel, via mail to De'Von Walker and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Ludvigson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Von L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ludvigson
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Dekeyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Gerritson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle K Tritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K DeYoung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Moungey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Sabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?