West v. Kind et al
Plaintiff: Rufus West
Defendant: John Kind, Scott Eckstein, Pete Ericksen, Brian Foster, Sarah Cooper, Brad Hompe, Cindy O'Donnell and John and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2017cv00482
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/12/2024. 104 Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings GRANTED as related to plaintiff's Fourth Amendment Claim. 117 Defendants' motion to dismiss GRANTED IN PART as related to plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/4/2024. 100 Plaintiff's objections to the court's order for injunctive relief OVERRULED. 94 Order for Injunctive Relief is the court's final order on plaintiff's RLUIPA claim. 117 Defendants' motion to dismiss injunctive relief claims DENIED AS MOOT as to RLUIPA claim. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/2/2023. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/9/2020. 28 Defendants' motion for summary judgment GRANTED. 42 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Rufus West at Redgranite Correctional Institution)(cb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/17/2019. 24 Plaintiff's motion to compel DENIED as moot. 46 Plaintiff's motion for sanctions DENIED. 47 Plaintiff's motion for costs and fees DENIED. 53 Plaintiff's motion to strik e defendants' response DENIED. 54 Plaintiff's motion for default judgment DENIED. 65 Plaintiff's motion for cease and desist harassment order DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Rufus West at Redgranite Correctional Institution) (cb)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/4/2018 DENYING 19 Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Rufus West at Green Bay Correctional Institution) (cb)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/31/2018. Defendants John and Jane Doe and Pete Ericksen DISMISSED. Plaintiff's request to appoint counsel DENIED without prejudice. Defendants Kind, Eckstein, Hompe, O'Donnell and Buhle to file respo nsive pleading to amended complaint within 60 days. Parties may not begin discovery until the court enters scheduling order setting deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Rufus West at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/3/2018. 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee GRANTED; agency having custody of plaintiff to collect $320.03 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's pr ison trust account under 28 USC §1915(b)(2). 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to appoint counsel DENIED without prejudice. By end of day 5/4/2018, plaintiff to file amended complaint; failure to file by deadline may result in dismissal of case for failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Rufus West and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/18/2017 DENYING 2 Plaintiff's motion for order to have the filing fee paid from the release account. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff) (pwm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Kind et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Eckstein
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Ericksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hompe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?