Le Bleu Corp v. Federal Mfg LLC et al

Plaintiff: Le Bleu Corp
Defendant: Federal Mfg LLC and Pro Mach Inc
Counter_claimant: Federal Mfg LLC
Counter_defendant: Le Bleu Corp
Case Number: 2:2017cv00549
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/10/2018. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that defendants Federal Manufacturing, LLC, and Pro Mach, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 57 ) be GRANTED in p art AND DENIED in part. The motion is granted as to Counts III and IV of the amended complaint, and the motion is denied as to Counts I, II, V, VI, and VII. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that defendant Pro Mach, Inc., be dismissed from this action. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/2/18 DENYING Le Bleu's motion to compel production of certain emails 50 and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Le Bleu's motion to compel production of certain information relating to piercing Fed eral's corporate veil 52 . Motion 52 is granted to the extent that Federal must produce documents sufficient to show whether Federal filed state and federal tax returns for the years 2014 to 2016. In all other respects, the motion is denied. (cc: all counsel) (kwb)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 03/19/2018. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants motion to strike 47 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to compel 43 is STRICKEN. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to restrict 46 is DENIED as MOOT. (cc: all counsel) (lls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le Bleu Corp v. Federal Mfg LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Bleu Corp
Represented By: Lorin J Lapidus
Represented By: Stuart Hale Russell
Represented By: Grover Gray Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mfg LLC
Represented By: Andrew Allen Freeman
Represented By: Daniel A Ruley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Mach Inc
Represented By: Andrew Allen Freeman
Represented By: Daniel A Ruley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Federal Mfg LLC
Represented By: Andrew Allen Freeman
Represented By: Daniel A Ruley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Le Bleu Corp
Represented By: Lorin J Lapidus
Represented By: Stuart Hale Russell
Represented By: Grover Gray Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?