H-D USA LLC et al v. SunFrog LLC et al
Plaintiff: H-D USA LLC and Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group LLC
Defendant: SunFrog LLC and John Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00711
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/27/2018: ADOPTING 73 Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal; DISMISSING without prejudice Plaintiffs' request for compensatory damages for non-counterfeiting acts of infringement that are requested in Counts Two, Three, Four, Six, and Seven of Plaintiffs' Complaint; DISMISSING without prejudice Count Five of Plaintiffs' Complaint; VACATING the remaining deadlines of 26 the Court's 7/14/2017 Trial Scheduling Order; DISMISSING the John Doe Defendants from this action; and DISMISSING CASE. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/12/2018: GRANTING in part 43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and GRANTING 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Documents. Plaintiffs AWARDED statutory damages in the amount of $19,200,000 as to Count One of the Complaint, counterfeiting under the Lanham Act; entry of judgment on that count will await complete disposition of all claims in this action. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/22/2018 GRANTING 69 Parties' Joint Request for Entry of Protective Order and SPECIFYING the terms as modified for confidential information produced or disclosed during this matter. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/4/2017 DENYING 27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/31/2017: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and GRANTING 15 and 31 Defendant's Motions to Restrict Documents. Defendant SunFrog ENJOINED and RESTRAINED as specified pending final disposition of this action. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H-D USA LLC et al v. SunFrog LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-D USA LLC
Represented By: Stephanie H Bald
Represented By: David M Kelly
Represented By: Katherine W Schill
Represented By: Sabrina Y Shyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group LLC
Represented By: Stephanie H Bald
Represented By: David M Kelly
Represented By: Katherine W Schill
Represented By: Sabrina Y Shyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunFrog LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?