Terry v. County of Milwaukee et al

Plaintiff: Rebecca Terry
Defendant: County of Milwaukee, David A Clarke, Jr, Brian Wenzel, Unknown Employees of Milwaukee County Jail, Unknown Jail Supervisors, Armor Correctional Health Services, Carolyn Exum, Morgan Bevenue, Margaret Hoover, Unknown Employees of Armor Correctional Health Services and Unknown Armor Healthcare Supervisors
Case Number: 2:2017cv01112
Filed: August 10, 2017
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/12/2018. 132 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Her Deposition and Interrogatory Responses is DENIED. 134 Milwaukee County Defendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Supplemen tal Interrogatory Responses, 136 Milwaukee County Defendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Deposition Question Responses, and 137 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services' Expedited Motion to Compel a Second Deposition of Plaintiff are GRANTED as specified in this Order. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
June 4, 2018 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/4/2018 GRANTING 77 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 81 Defendant Milwaukee County's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff 's Monell claim against such defendants based on a widespread custom or practice of ignoring inmates' serious medical needs is DISMISSED. Plaintiff may FILE an amended complaint within 10 days. The dispostive motion deadline is E XTENDED to 7/2/2018; responses to a dispositive motion are due within 21 days after the motion is filed; replies are due within 7 days of the filing of the response; no extensions of such deadlines will be considered. Defendant David David A. Clarke, Jr. is DISMISSED from this action; Plaintiff's personal capacity claims against Defendant Clarke are DISMISSED; the Clerk of Court shall SUBSTITUTE Richard R. Schmidt in place of Defendant Clarke on the docket as to Plaintiff's official capacity claims. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
April 30, 2018 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/30/2018 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 101 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Extend Deadlines. Sanctions are not warranted at this time; the dates of 39 the Court's 1/10/2018 Trial Scheduling Order will be EXTENDED by separate order. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
April 4, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/4/2018: GRANTING 52 Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Corporation's ("WCMIC's") Motion to Intervene; DIRECTING Clerk of Court to separately docket WCMIC's third-party complaint for declaratory judgment against Defendant Morgan Benevue (Docket #52-1); and DENYING as moot 96 Defendant Milwaukee County's Motion for Order Granting WCMIC's Motion to Intervene. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
March 21, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/21/2018 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 60 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
March 13, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/13/2018: DENYING 54 , 66 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services' Motions to Stay or for Bifurcation and DENYING 63 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services' Motion to Convert Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel to a Non-Expedited Motion. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
March 5, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/5/2018 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 49 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
January 16, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 1/16/2018: GRANTING 35 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and DISMISSING with prejudice Count V of Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket #1). (cc: all counsel) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. County of Milwaukee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Terry
Represented By: Aisha N Davis
Represented By: Theresa Kleinhaus
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Jonathan I Loevy
Represented By: Scott Rauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Milwaukee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Clarke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees of Milwaukee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jail Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Exum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Bevenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees of Armor Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Armor Healthcare Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?