Oswald v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Perry Oswald
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Scott Walker, Brian Foster, Jeffery Manlove, Belinda Schrubbe, McCreedy, Micheal Charles, Christine DeYoung, Nancy Kampuis, Jane/John Doe, Stadtmueller, John Doe and Weber
Case Number: 2:2017cv01437
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Sheboygan
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/25/2019 DENYING as moot 27 plaintiff's motion for extension of time; DENYING 28 plaintiff's motion to compel. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Daniel Oswald at Jackson Correctional Institution) (cb)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/27/2018. 25 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel DENIED without prejudice. Discovery deadline EXTENDED to 2/1/2019; dispositive motions deadline EXTENDED to 4/1/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Daniel Oswald at Jackson Correctional Institution)(cb)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/26/2018 DENYING 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Daniel Oswald at Jackson Correctional Institution) (cb)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2018. Defendants to respond to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by end of day 9/4/2018; plaintiff may file reply by end of day 9/18/2018. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Daniel Oswald at Jackson Correctional Institution)(cb)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/21/2018. 2 Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee GRANTED. 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to pay filing fee from release account DENIED; agency having custody of plain tiff to collection $347.39 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust account under 28 U.S.C. §1915(b)(2). 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to amend complaint GRANTED; amended complaint at dkt. no. 9 is operative complain t in this case. Court DEFERS RULING on 10 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Defendants Stadtmueller, Walker, Foster, John Doe (RHU Program Supervisor) DISMISSED. Remaining defendants to file responsive pleading to complaint within 60 days. Parties shall not begin discovery until the court enters scheduling order setting deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Daniel Oswald and Warden at Kettle Moraine Correctional Institution)(cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oswald v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Perry Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Manlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCreedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine DeYoung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Kampuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stadtmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?