Frankowiak v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Gregory Frankowiak
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01447
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/13/2018 APPROVING 18 stipulation for EAJA attorney fees. Defendant to pay plaintiff $3,187.50 in attorney fees in full satisfaction and settlement of any and all claims plaintiff may have in this case under the EAJA. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/17/2018 APPROVING 15 Joint Stipulation to Remand for Further Proceedings. Commissioner's denial of benefits REVERSED and case REMANDED to Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. §405(g). (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/7/2017 GRANTING 3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankowiak v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Frankowiak
Represented By: Robert C Angermeier
Represented By: Vincent R Angermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?