Williams v. Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joyce M Williams
Defendant: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00354
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re 98 Brief filed by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/31/2022. Insofar as Farmers' brief may be construed as a motion for summary judgment (or any other relief), it is denied. The court finds that Farmers is not entitled to judgment in its favor. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/15/2022. See Order for details. Defendant's Motion in Limine 87 is untimely and DENIED on that basis; however, witness may testify. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike this m otion in limine 93 is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant's Motion in Limine 88 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine 90 is DENIED. Briefing on issue of existence of a contract: Deft's brief due 3/23/2022; Pltf's response due 3/30/2022. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SECOND AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/2/2021. The grants the defendant's motion to continue the jury trial. Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 3/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/ 2022 11:00 AM in By Video Conference before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The Zoom link will be set to the parties one week before the hearing. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022-4/15/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 242, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/7/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Joyce Williams's "Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendant's Non-Retained Experts" (ECF No. 29 ) is denied. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that Joyce Williams's "Motion to Disregard Hearsay in the Aurora Medical Records" (ECF No. 29 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Joyce Williams's "Motion to Strike An Unnamed Expert Witness" (ECF No. 48 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Joyce Williams's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 33 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Farmers' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 28 ) is denied. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 5/22/2018 DENYING 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce M Williams
Represented By: Gregory J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Asim K Desai
Represented By: Margaret M Drugan
Represented By: Jiyeon Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?