Murphy v. Hartman et al.

Plaintiff: Shawn Murphy
Defendant: C Hartman, James Muenchow, N Kamphuis, Brett Helmer, Aimee Wilson and Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2018cv00584
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/19/2018. 10 Plaintiff's motion to dismiss case GRANTED. 14 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time DENIED as moot. Case DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Shawn Murphy at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
August 27, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/27/2018 GRANTING 2 plaintiff's MOTION for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee; agency having custody of plaintiff to collect $348.27 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's pr ison trust account under 28 USC §1915(b)(2). Defendants Muenchow, Wilson, Wisconsin Department of Corrections, Helmer and Kamphuis DISMISSED. Defendant Hartman to file responsive pleading within 60 days. Parties shall not begin discovery until after the court issues scheduling order setting deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Shawn Murphy and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
May 7, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/7/2018 GRANTING 7 plaintiff's motion to pay initial partial filing fee from release account. By 5/21/2018 Waupun Correctional Institution to forward $1.73 to clerk of court from plaintiff's release account. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Shawn Murphy and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Hartman et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Muenchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Kamphuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?