The Estate of Kristina Ann Fiebrink et al v. Armor Correctional Health Service Inc et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Kristina Ann Fiebrink, The Estate of Angelica M Fiebrink, Jose D Martinez, Jr and Robert Martinez
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Service Inc, Karen Ronquillo-Horton, Brooke Shaikh, Veronica Wallace, Briteny R Kirk, Eva Cage, Brandon Decker, Milwaukee County, David A Clarke, Jr, Richard R Schmidt, Latisha Aikens, Brian Piasecki, Jennifer Matthews, Latrail Cole, Latoya Renfro, John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Evanston Insurance Company and Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00832
Filed: May 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/3/2019. 74 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts One and Two of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 193 Milwauke e County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 210 Armor Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 219 Defendants Eva Cage and Briteny Kirk's M otion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 223 Defendant Veronica Wallace's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Count I of the Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' respondeat superior claim, is DISMISSED again st Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services Inc. Count II of the Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Monell claims against Defendants Armor Correctional Health Services Inc. and Milwaukee County are DISMISSED. Count I of the Amended Complaint, Pl aintiffs' Eighth Amendment claim, and Count III of the Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Section 1983 loss of consortium claim, are DISMISSED as to Defendants Latrail Cole, Veronica Wallace, Brandon Decker, Eva Cage, and Briteny Kirk. Counts IV and V of the Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' negligence and state law loss of companionship claims, are DISMISSED as to Defendants Veronica Wallace and Latrail Cole. Defendants Veronica Wallace and Latrail Cole are DISMISSED from this a ction. 228 Defendants Eva Cage and Briteny Kirk's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED; Attorney Ronald E Neroda is terminated as counsel. 241 Plaintiffs' Motion to Restrict Document is GRANTED. 257 Armor Defendants' Motion to Restrict Document is GRANTED. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/18/2018 DENYING as moot 20 , 30 , 32 , 42 and 53 Defendants' Dispositive Motions directed at 1 Plaintiffs' Original Complaint. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/13/2018 DENYING 29 Defendant Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.'s Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Kristina Ann Fiebrink et al v. Armor Correctional Health Service Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Kristina Ann Fiebrink
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Represented By: Christopher P Katers
Represented By: David J Lang
Represented By: Kevin G Raasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Angelica M Fiebrink
Represented By: Christopher P Katers
Represented By: David J Lang
Represented By: Kevin G Raasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose D Martinez, Jr
Represented By: Christopher P Katers
Represented By: David J Lang
Represented By: Kevin G Raasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Martinez
Represented By: James J Gende, II
Represented By: Christopher P Katers
Represented By: David J Lang
Represented By: Kevin G Raasch
Represented By: Mark L Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ronquillo-Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Shaikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briteny R Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Cage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Clarke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard R Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latisha Aikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Piasecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latrail Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Renfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?