Harden v. Schroeder et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Harden
Defendant: Rebecca Matoska-Mentink and Bruce E Schroeder
Case Number: 2:2018cv01109
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Waushara
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $20.99, receipt number MK4689-073702. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding his attempts to comply with the 8/31/2018 deadline to pay the initial partial filing fee. (lz)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 DISBURSEMENT REQUEST to RGCI for payment of Jerry Harden's filing fee. (mlm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Pay Full Filing Fee from Release Account by Jerry Harden. (mlm)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/13/2018. The court GRANTS, in part, Harden's motion to pay the filing fee from his release account (ECF No. #5 ). The court will allow Harden to pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account; however, he will be required to pay the remainder of the filing fee over time through deductions from his general account. The court ORDERS that, upon request from Harden, the agency having custody of him shall withdraw $20.99 from his release account and forward that sum to the clerk of court as the initial partial filing fee. The court will send a copy of this order to the agency that has custody of Harden. (cc: all counsel, to plaintiff and Warden via USPS) (mlm)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/10/2018 that on or before August 31, 2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 20.99 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 Additional Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Feb 2018) by Jerry Harden. (mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (March-July) by Jerry Harden. (mlm) Modified on 8/9/2018 (mlm).
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff re: he was only able to get 5 months of his trust account statement. (mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Court Order to pay his full filing fee from his release account savings by Jerry Harden. (mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jerry Harden. (mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jerry Harden. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form and either the filing fee or request to proceed without prepaying the filing form/prisoner trust account be filed within 21 days. (amb)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Jerry Harden. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons, #3 Bookmarked Exhibits)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden v. Schroeder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Matoska-Mentink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce E Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?