Allstate Indemnity Company v. Electrolux Home Products Inc

Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01194
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company. Electrolux Home Products Inc served on 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Filing)(Dvorak, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dvorak, Amy)
August 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products Inc. (asc)
August 2, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Allstate Indemnity Company (Dvorak, Amy)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. by Allstate Indemnity Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2890424) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dvorak, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Electrolux Home Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Amy L Dvorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?