Williams et al v. Milwaukee County et al
Plaintiff: obo L.W. Laqesha Green, Estate of Terry Williams, Cuc Huynh and L W
Defendant: Milwaukee County Sheriff's Department, Michael T Truax, David A Clarke, Jr, Milwaukee County and John Doe Sheriff's Deputies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv01222
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stern, Walter)
September 17, 2018 FINAL NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than September 24, 2018. The form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
August 31, 2018 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than September 14, 2018. The form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
August 31, 2018 Summons Issued as to David A Clarke, Jr, Milwaukee County, Milwaukee County Sheriff's Department, Michael T Truax. (blr)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stern, Walter)
August 30, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons is blank - in the future please remember to submit completed summons. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (blr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stern, Walter)
August 15, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons is blank - in the future please remember to submit completed summons. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stern, Walter)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stern, Walter)
August 10, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The jury demand has been modified - please remember to verify that a jury demand is included in the initiating document. The summons is blank. Please submit a completed summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (blr)
August 9, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stern, Walter)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Estate of Terry Williams. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2894117)(Stern, Walter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Milwaukee County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Clarke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Sheriff's Deputies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: obo L.W. Laqesha Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Terry Williams
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuc Huynh
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L W
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?