Williams v. City of Racine
Plaintiff: Endel Williams
Defendant: City of Racine
Case Number: 2:2018cv01232
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Racine
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/5/2018: Interim Settlement Report due by 4/10/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 7/8/2019; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 7/12/2019; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 7/17/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 10/4/2018. (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (nb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by City of Racine. (Cohen, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by City of Racine.(Roubik, Marisa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/1/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 12, 2018 Due to non-consent this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by City of Racine. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cohen, Michael)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File a Response by City of Racine. (Roubik, Marisa)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa L Roubik on behalf of City of Racine. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael J. Cohen, Garrett A. Soberalski, Scott R. Letteney, Marisa L. Roubik (Roubik, Marisa)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer is due September 24, 2018. signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on September 4, 2018. (cc: all counsel) (cc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon D McDonald on behalf of Endel Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher M. Kloth (McDonald, Shannon)
August 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to City of Racine. (blr)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Endel Williams (McDonald, Shannon)
August 13, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved properly and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Endel Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McDonald, Shannon)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Endel Williams (McDonald, Shannon)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Endel Williams. (McDonald, Shannon)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against City of Racine by Endel Williams. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2895471) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonald, Shannon)
August 10, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Racine
Represented By: Michael J Cohen
Represented By: Marisa L Roubik
Represented By: Scott R Letteney
Represented By: Garrett A Soberalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endel Williams
Represented By: Shannon D McDonald
Represented By: Christopher M Kloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?