Leah Bitar v. REV Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Leah Bitar, Ramanitharan Rajaram and Seth Marinoff
Defendant: Justin Fish, Jean Marie Canan, REV Group Inc, Thomas B Phillips, Joel Rotroff, Charles Dutil, Kim Marvin, Dino Cusumano, Timothy W Sullivan, Dean J Nolden, Paul Bamatter, Jefferies LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, American Industrial Partners and Donn J Viola
Petitioner: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Case Number: 2:2018cv01268
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 97 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System re #66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter . (Blythin, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 96 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC re #66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Motto, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Filing 95 APPENDIX by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola REV Group's Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities for Response to Motion to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Case 1 - Alloc v. Unlin, #2 Appendix Case 2 - Collaboration Properties Inc v Tandberg ASA, #3 Appendix Case 3 - Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v Mortgage Law Group LLP, #4 Appendix Case 4 - Diaz v Ameriquest Mortgage Company, #5 Appendix Case 5 - In re Rewalk Robotics Ltd Stockholder Litigation, #6 Appendix Case 6 - Jones v. Scientific Colors Inc, #7 Appendix Case 7 - Member Select Insurance Company v Cub Cadet LLC, #8 Appendix Case 8 - Novelty Inc v Mountain View Marketing Inc, #9 Appendix Case 9 - Ohio Organizing Collaborative v Husted, #10 Appendix Case 10 - Song v Rom, #11 Appendix Case 11 - Talton v Unisource Network Services Inc, #12 Appendix Case 12 - West Virginia Laborers Trust Fund v STEC Inc)(Lovern, Susan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 94 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola re #66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter . (Lovern, Susan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 93 BRIEF in Support filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System re #66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter , pursuant to the Court's Order of July 10, 2019 (Dkt. No. 86 at 7-8), allowing additional briefing. (Blythin, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 7/30/19. Parties discussed pending motion to amend complaint. Motion was briefed. Court ordered fuller briefing of motion. Plaintiffs opening brief due 8/20/19. Defendants response brief due 9/3/19. (Court Reporter Susan Ambruster) (jad) Modified on 7/31/2019 (jad).
July 22, 2019 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 06/27/2019 before Judge Adelman Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski of Brown & Jones, Contact at 414-224-9533. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found #on our website or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (dl)
July 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 7/30/19 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lynn Adelman. Due to the large number of participants, parties should call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be placed on hold until we access the call. Parties should still notify the court via email re who will be participating. (jad)
July 11, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J Waterstreet on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. Attorney(s) appearing: Derek J. Waterstreet (Waterstreet, Derek)
July 11, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Substitution by Susan E Lovern on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. Attorney A.J. Peterman to be termed. (Lovern, Susan)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 7/25/19 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lynn Adelman. (jad)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/11/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 7/22/19 at 11:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/10/19 denying #72 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and granting #73 , #80 and #82 Motion to Seal Documents. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/5/19. Oral Arguments set for 6/27/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 390, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge Lynn Adelman. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
April 15, 2019 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Susan E. Lovern in Support of the REV Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the REV Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and Bernstein Liebhard, LLP as Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B - Order, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff-Respondent's Reply in Further Support of the Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #4 Exhibit D - Response Brief of Plaintiff-Respondent)(Lovern, Susan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 83 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola re #82 Expedited MOTION to Seal Document in Support of the REV Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and Bernstein Liebhard, LLP as Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Reply Memorandum in Support of the REV Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and Bernstein Liebhard LLP as Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #2 Appendix Redacted Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities, #3 Appendix Sealed Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Lovern, Susan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 82 Expedited MOTION to Seal Document by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. (Lovern, Susan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 81 DECLARATION of John D. Blythin in Opposition to REV Group, Inc. Defendants' Motion to Disqualify (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Amended complaint filed in Yandoli v. REV Group, Inc. et al., Case No. 2018-CV-001163, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiffs-Respondents renewed motion to dismiss the appeal and incorporated memorandum of law in Yandoli v. REV Group, Inc.)(Blythin, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 80 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Restrict Document submitted as Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the REV Defendants Motion to Disqualify, as well as portions of the Declaration of Michael S. Bigin in Opposition to the REV Defendants Motion to Disqualify by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Blythin, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Michael S. Bigin in Opposition to REV Group, Inc. Defendants' Motion to Disqualify (Attachments: #1 Redacted version for public filing)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Blythin, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 78 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System re #72 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Bernstein Liebhard LLP and Lead Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System . (Attachments: #1 Redacted version for public filing)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Blythin, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola (Lovern, Susan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Randall W. Bodner in Support of the REV Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and Bernstein Liebhard, LLP as Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Sealed Declaration of Randall W. Bodner)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Lovern, Susan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Susan E. Lovern in Support of the REV Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and Bernstein Liebhard, LLP as Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - REV Defendants Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Filed on July 31, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - REV Defendants Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Filed on August 13, 2018, #3 Exhibit C - REV Defendants Petition for Leave to Appeal and Supporting Memorandum, #4 Exhibit D - November 26, 2018 Order, #5 Exhibit E - October 12, 2017 REV Group Press Release)(Lovern, Susan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 74 BRIEF in Support filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola re #73 Expedited MOTION to Seal Document , #72 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Bernstein Liebhard LLP and Lead Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System . (Attachments: #1 Sealed Memorandum in Support of the REV Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and Bernstein Liebhard LLP as Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #2 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Lovern, Susan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 73 Expedited MOTION to Seal Document by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. (Lovern, Susan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Bernstein Liebhard LLP and Lead Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. (Lovern, Susan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC Re Underwriter Defrendants' Response to Lead Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint Instanter (Motto, Joseph)
March 7, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC re #66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter . (Motto, Joseph)
March 7, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola (Noyes, Kelly)
March 7, 2019 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Kelly J. Noyes in Support of REV Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law)(Noyes, Kelly)
March 7, 2019 Filing 67 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola re #66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter . (Noyes, Kelly)
February 28, 2019 Filing 66 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, instanter by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Blythin, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 65 Second Letter from Court to Plaintiff Seth Marinoff's Counsel re Attorney Admission and ECF Registration. (bx)
February 4, 2019 Filing 64 Second Letter from Court to Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram's Counsel re Attorney Admission and ECF Registration. (bx)
January 18, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R Seidman, Jr on behalf of Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. (Seidman, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Bigin on behalf of Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael S. Bigin (Bigin, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola (Lovern, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Susan E. Lovern in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1/17/17 Form S-1 Amended Registration Statement, #2 Exhibit B - 12/21/17 REV Fiscal Year Report, #3 Exhibit C - 9/7/17 Fiscal Guidance, #4 Exhibit D - 6/6/17 Fiscal Guidance, #5 Exhibit E - 10/10/17 Fiscal Guidance, #6 Exhibit F - 10/10/17 Form S-1 Secondary Registration Statement, #7 Exhibit G - 12/19/17 Fiscal Guidance, #8 Exhibit H - 3/7/18 Fiscal Guidance, #9 Exhibit I - 3/8/18 Q1 Earnings Call Final Transcript, #10 Exhibit J - USA Today Article, #11 Exhibit K - 6/6/18 Fiscal Guidance, #12 Exhibit L - 6/7/17 Fiscal Guidance, #13 Exhibit M - 6/7/18 Q2 Earnings Call Final Transcript, #14 Exhibit N - Yandoli Order, #15 Exhibit O - 9/5/18 Fiscal Guidance, #16 Exhibit P - 3/7/18 Form 10-Q, #17 Exhibit Q - 6/6/18 Form 10-Q, #18 Exhibit R - 12/19/18 Fiscal Guidance, #19 Exhibit S - 3/13/18 Sullivan Form 4, #20 Exhibit T - 1/11/17 REV Form 8-K)(Lovern, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 59 BRIEF in Support filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Consolidated Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)(Lovern, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Consolidated Amended Complaint by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. (Lovern, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 57 BRIEF in Support filed by American Industrial Partners re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Bosack, Sean)
January 11, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Compliant by American Industrial Partners. (Bosack, Sean) Modified on 1/14/2019 (bx).
January 11, 2019 Filing 55 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Industrial Partners. (Bosack, Sean)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/28/18 granting #53 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
December 27, 2018 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola of Joint Stipulated Civil L. R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Leave to Extend Page Limits (Noyes, Kelly)
December 27, 2018 Filing 53 Joint Stipulated Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan, Donn J Viola. (Noyes, Kelly) Modified on 12/28/2018 (bx).
December 27, 2018 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Industrial Partners (Bosack, Sean)
December 27, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Konkel on behalf of American Industrial Partners. Attorney(s) appearing: David R. Konkel (Konkel, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Blinka on behalf of American Industrial Partners. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel J. Blinka (Blinka, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean O Bosack on behalf of American Industrial Partners. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean O'D. Bosack (Bosack, Sean)
December 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to American Industrial Partners. (jcl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 48 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System (Blythin, John)
November 30, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Motto on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph L. Motto (Motto, Joseph)
November 28, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Y Sperling on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Robert Y. Sperling (Sperling, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Splitek on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Splitek (Splitek, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION (second) to Set Schedule for Filing of an Amended Complaint and Defendants' Responses Thereto (corrected) by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Blythin, John)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to American Industrial Partners, Donn J Viola. (cms)
November 26, 2018 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (corrected) with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System.(Blythin, John)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re consolidated cases signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/26/18. IT IS ORDERED that docket entries 34, 35, 36 and 37 in Case 18-C-1269 are STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that docket entries 49, 50, 51, 52 and 53 in Case 18-C-1270 are STRICKEN. Attorney Splitek shall refile his Notice of Appearance in Case 18-C-1268. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that docket entries 38 and 39 in Case 18-C-1268 are STRICKEN. Counsel shall refile those documents with a corrected caption. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 23, 2018 Filing 41 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System (Blythin, John)
November 23, 2018 Filing 40 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System (Blythin, John)
November 21, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
November 20, 2018 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT : CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Attachments: #1 Summons on additional Defendant Donn J. Viola, #2 Summons on additional Defendant American Industrial Partners)(Blythin, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 38 SECOND STIPULATION to Set Schedule for Filing of an Amended Complaint and Defendants' Responses Thereto by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Blythin, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 37 DISCLOSURE Statement by BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Splitek, Matthew)
October 1, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Set Schedule for Filing of an Amended Complaint and Defendants' Responses Thereto by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. (Lovern, Susan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W Hackbarth on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan W. Hackbarth (Hackbarth, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Conley on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co Inc, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel E. Conley (Conley, Daniel)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/19/18 granting #19 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #19 Motion to Appoint ; granting #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
September 13, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System notice of non-opposition to its pending renewed motion to consolidate the above-captioned related actions, for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of its selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as lead counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as liaison counsel for the proposed Class (Marinoff Dkt. No. 19) (Blythin, John)
September 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (kah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan (Lovern, Susan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 31 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lovern, Susan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE Statement by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. (Lovern, Susan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 29 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blythin, John)
August 31, 2018 DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. NOTICE from the clerk to all defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb) Modified on 8/31/2018 (amb).
August 30, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Cianci on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark A. Cianci (Cianci, Mark)
August 30, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Johnson Palmer on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne Johnson Palmer (Johnson Palmer, Anne)
August 30, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall W Bodner on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Randall Bodner (Bodner, Randall)
August 28, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD OF DAVID HURWITZ AND PAUL CHAN (Lovern, Susan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by A J Peterman on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: A.J. Peterman (Peterman, A)
August 28, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J Noyes on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Kelly J. Noyes (Noyes, Kelly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Lovern on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan E. Lovern (Lovern, Susan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Daniel Sadeh in support of Movant Houston Municipal Employees Pension System's motion to consolidate actions, appoint lead plaintiff and appoint lead counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Early Notice, #2 Exhibit B: Certification, #3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D: Bernstein Liebhard LLP firm resume, #5 Exhibit E: Ademi & O'Reilly, LLP firm resume)(Blythin, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases related actions 18-cv-1269, 18-cv-1270 and 18-cv-1268 MOTION to Appoint lead plaintiff to Appoint Movant Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action MOTION to Appoint Counsel approving Movant's selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigation . (Blythin, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases related actions 18-cv-1269, 18-cv-1270 and 18-cv-1268, MOTION to Appoint lead plaintiff to Appoint Movant Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action, MOTION to Appoint Counsel approving Movant's selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigation by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consolidating related actions, appointing lead plaintiff and counsel)(Blythin, John)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Response Dates for Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 08/27/2018. See order for details and deadlines. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Blythin on behalf of Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. Attorney(s) appearing: John D. Blythin (Blythin, John)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-06239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN #13 by Judge S. James Otero. Case transferred to Eastern District of Wisconsin. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (smo) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Wisconsin filed by defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order to Transfer Venue)(Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-05095 SJO(SSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-06239 SJO(SSx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anne Johnson Palmer counsel for Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. Adding Anne Johnson Palmer as counsel of record for REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Joel Rotroff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Anne Johnson Palmer. (Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Paul Bamatter(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Jean Marie Canan(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Dino Cusumano(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Charles Dutil(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Justin Fish(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Kim Marvin(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Dean J. Nolden(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Thomas B. Phillips(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party REV Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Joel Rotroff(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Timothy W. Sullivan(pty:dft))(Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul S Chan counsel for Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. Adding Paul S. Chan as counsel of record for REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Joel Rotroff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Joel Rotroff. (Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Paul Bamatter(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Jean Marie Canan(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Dino Cusumano(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Charles Dutil(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Justin Fish(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Kim Marvin(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Dean J. Nolden(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Thomas B. Phillips(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party REV Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Joel Rotroff(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Timothy W. Sullivan(pty:dft))(Chan, Paul) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants All Defendants, identifying REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Joel Rotroff, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Entities affiliated with American Industrial Partners. (Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Paul Bamatter(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Jean Marie Canan(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Dino Cusumano(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Charles Dutil(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Justin Fish(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Kim Marvin(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Dean J. Nolden(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Thomas B. Phillips(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party REV Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Joel Rotroff(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Timothy W. Sullivan(pty:dft))(Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05095-SJO-SS, 2:18-cv-05693-SJO-SS (Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leah Bitar, (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Leah Bitar. (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leah Bitar. (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22113396 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Leah Bitar. (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Leah Bitar(pty:pla))(Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leah Bitar v. REV Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Fish
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Marie Canan
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REV Group Inc
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B Phillips
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Rotroff
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dutil
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Marvin
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino Cusumano
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Sullivan
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean J Nolden
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bamatter
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: A J Peterman
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co Inc
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Jonathan W Hackbarth
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Robert Y Sperling
Represented By: Joseph L Motto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Industrial Partners
Represented By: Sean O Bosack
Represented By: Daniel J Blinka
Represented By: David R Konkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donn J Viola
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Bitar
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Peretz Bronstein
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramanitharan Rajaram
Represented By: Robert V Prongay
Represented By: Lionel Z Glancy
Represented By: Howard G Smith
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Marinoff
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Represented By: Stephanie M Beige
Represented By: Daniel Sadeh
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Joseph R Seidman, Jr
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: Stanley D Bernstein
Represented By: Michael S Bigin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?