Ramanitharan Rajaram v REV Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ramanitharan Rajaram
Defendant: Justin Fish, Jean Marie Canan, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Jefferies LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, REV Group Inc, Thomas B Phillips, Joel Rotroff, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Charles Dutil, Kim Marvin, Goldman Sachs & Co, Morgan Stanley & Co, Dino Cusumano, Timothy W Sullivan, Dean J Nolden, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Paul Bamatter, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co LLC and Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Petitioner: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Case Number: 2:2018cv01270
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Splitek on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, Jefferies LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co LLC, Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Splitek (Splitek, Matthew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 48 LETTER regarding ECF registration and admission (jcl)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/19/18 granting #33 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #33 Motion to Appoint ; granting #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
September 13, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System notice of non-opposition to its pending renewed motion to consolidate the above-captioned related actions, for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of its selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as lead counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as liaison counsel for the proposed Class (Marinoff Dkt. No. 19) (Blythin, John)
September 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (kah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan (Lovern, Susan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 45 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lovern, Susan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 44 DISCLOSURE Statement by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. (Lovern, Susan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 43 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blythin, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record of David Hurwitz and Paul Chan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lovern, Susan)
August 31, 2018 DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. NOTICE from the clerk to defendants REV Group Inc, Timothy W Sullivan, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Joel Rotroff, Kim Marvin requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb) Modified on 8/31/2018 (amb).
August 30, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Cianci on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark A. Cianci (Cianci, Mark)
August 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Johnson Palmer on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne Johnson Palmer (Johnson Palmer, Anne)
August 30, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall W Bodner on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Randall Bodner (Bodner, Randall)
August 28, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by A J Peterman on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: A.J. Peterman (Peterman, A)
August 28, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J Noyes on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Kelly J. Noyes (Noyes, Kelly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Lovern on behalf of Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J Nolden, Thomas B Phillips, REV Group Inc, Joel Rotroff, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan E. Lovern (Lovern, Susan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Daniel Sadeh in support of Movant Houston Municipal Employees Pension System's motion to consolidate actions, appoint lead plaintiff and appoint lead counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Early Notice, #2 Exhibit B: Certification, #3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D: Bernstein Liebhard LLP firm resume, #5 Exhibit E: Ademi & O'Reilly, LLP firm resume)(Blythin, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 34 BRIEF in Support filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System re #33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases related actions 18-cv-1269, 18-cv-1270 and 18-cv-1268 MOTION to Appoint lead plaintiff to Appoint Movant Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action MOTION to Appoint Counsel approving Movant's selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigation . (Blythin, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases related actions 18-cv-1269, 18-cv-1270 and 18-cv-1268, MOTION to Appoint lead plaintiff to Appoint Movant Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action, MOTION to Appoint Counsel approving Movant's selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigation by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consolidating related actions, appointing lead plaintiff and counsel)(Blythin, John)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Setting Response Dates for Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 08/27/2018. See order for details and deadlines. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Blythin on behalf of Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. Attorney(s) appearing: John D. Blythin (Blythin, John)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 16, 2018 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-05693. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN by Judge S. James Otero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Stipulation is granted. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Change Venue to EASTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN filed by Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Suspending Deadline to Respond to Complaint #24 by Judge S. James Otero. (SEE ATTACHMENT ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. correcting Stipulation for Order,,,,, #24 (Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Order SUSPENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendants BMO Capital Markets Corp., Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Credit Suisses Securities USA LLC, Dino Cusumano, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, Jefferies LLC, Kim Marvin, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Joel Rotroff, Stifel, Nicolaus and Company, Incorporated, Timothy W. Sullivan, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party BMO Capital Markets Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Credit Suisses Securities USA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Jefferies LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Stifel, Nicolaus and Company, Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Wells Fargo Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Randall W. Bodner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan and designating Paul S. Chan as local counsel #17 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul S. Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22059297) #16 , for the following reasons: Name on docket entry was incorrect and duplicate PHV application filed with 17 using correct name on docket. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-05095 SJO(SSx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05693 SJO(SSx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram, upon Defendant REV Group, Inc. served on 7/10/2018, answer due 7/31/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Defendant REV Group, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Portnoy, Lesley) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul S. Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22059297) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Name on docket entry was incorrect and duplicate PHV application filed with 17 using correct name on docket. (lt) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Randall W. Bodner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/9/2018, Receipt No. 26ARO653) filed by Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul S. Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22059297) filed by Defendants Dean J. Nolden, REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anne Johnson Palmer counsel for Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. Adding Anne Johnson Palmer as counsel of record for REV Group, Inc., Timothy W. Sullivan, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Joel Rotroff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Anne Johnson Palmer. (Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Paul Bamatter(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Jean Marie Canan(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Dino Cusumano(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Charles Dutil(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Justin Fish(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Kim Marvin(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Dean J. Nolden(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Thomas B. Phillips(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party REV Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Joel Rotroff(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Timothy W. Sullivan(pty:dft))(Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul S Chan counsel for Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. Adding Defendants as counsel of record for REV Group, Inc.,; Timothy W. Sullivan; Dean J. Nolden; Thomas B. Phillips; Paul Bamatter; Jean Marie Canan; Dino Cusumano; Charles Dutil; Justin Fish; Kim Marvin; Joel Rotroff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants REV Group, Inc.; Timothy W. Sullivan; Dean J. Nolden; Thomas B. Phillips; Paul Bamatter; Jean Marie Canan; Dino Cusumano; Charles Dutil; Justin Fish; Kim Marvin; Joel Rotroff. (Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Paul Bamatter(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Jean Marie Canan(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Dino Cusumano(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Charles Dutil(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Justin Fish(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Kim Marvin(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Dean J. Nolden(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Thomas B. Phillips(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party REV Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Joel Rotroff(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Timothy W. Sullivan(pty:dft))(Chan, Paul) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05095 (Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Dino Cusumano, Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Kim Marvin, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Joel Rotroff, Timothy W. Sullivan, identifying Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; BMO Capital Markets Corp.; Jefferies LLC; Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC; Robert W. Baird & Co., Incorporated; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; AIP Entities (American Industrial Partners Capital Fund IV, LP; American Industrial Partners Capital Fund IV (Parallel), LP). (Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Paul Bamatter(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Jean Marie Canan(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Dino Cusumano(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Charles Dutil(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Justin Fish(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Kim Marvin(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Dean J. Nolden(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Thomas B. Phillips(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party REV Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Joel Rotroff(pty:dft), Attorney David I Hurwitz added to party Timothy W. Sullivan(pty:dft))(Hurwitz, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BMO Capital Markets Corp., Paul Bamatter, Jean Marie Canan, Credit Suisses Securities USA LLC, Dino Cusumano, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Charles Dutil, Justin Fish, Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, Jefferies LLC, Kim Marvin, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Dean J. Nolden, Thomas B. Phillips, REV Group, Inc., Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Joel Rotroff, Stifel, Nicolaus and Company, Incorporated, Timothy W. Sullivan, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram. (Portnoy, Lesley) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Howard G Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram, (Portnoy, Lesley) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram. (Portnoy, Lesley) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram. (Portnoy, Lesley) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22004548 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ramanitharan Rajaram. (Attorney Lesley F Portnoy added to party Ramanitharan Rajaram(pty:pla))(Portnoy, Lesley) [Transferred from cacd on 8/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramanitharan Rajaram v REV Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Fish
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Marie Canan
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Baird & Co Incorporated
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REV Group Inc
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B Phillips
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Rotroff
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dutil
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Marvin
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino Cusumano
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Sullivan
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean J Nolden
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities USA Inc
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bamatter
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Randall W Bodner
Represented By: Mark A Cianci
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: A J Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: David I Hurwitz
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramanitharan Rajaram
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Represented By: Robert V Prongay
Represented By: Lionel Z Glancy
Represented By: Howard G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: Daniel Sadeh
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Joseph R Seidman, Jr
Represented By: Stanley D Bernstein
Represented By: Stephanie M Beige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?