Mousa v. Sessions et al.
Plaintiff: Mr. Ameer Chassab Mousa and Ameer Chassab Mousa
Defendant: Ms. Kirstjen M Nielsen, US Atty General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Kay Leopold, Lee F Cissna, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Lee Francis Cissna and Kirstjen M Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2018cv01354
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/2/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ameer Chassab Mousa. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blackwell, Sarah)
October 1, 2018 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Jones be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
September 4, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website and do not add addresses for any party; Please refer to the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (vkb)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ameer Chassab Mousa. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2911024) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit)(Blackwell, Sarah)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 RE-FILED (with correct event); SEE #2 PETITION filed by Ameer Chassab Mousa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(Blackwell, Sarah) Modified on 8/31/2018 (blr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mousa v. Sessions et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Atty General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Leopold
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Ameer Chassab Mousa
Represented By: Sarah E Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameer Chassab Mousa
Represented By: Sarah E Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?