Mizysak v. Arrow Financial Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Mizysak
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services LLC, LVNV Funding LLC and Daubert Law Firm LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01400
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Natalie Mizysak. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 8882780296 and use access code 8322317# to join thecall. Rule 26(f) report shall be electronically filed with the court no later than November 7, 2018. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
October 23, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (lz)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Daubert Law Firm LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Larsen, Brett)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by LVNV Funding LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Foster, Nabil)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Natalie Mizysak Voluntary Dismissal as to Arrow Financial Services, LLC Only (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant Daubert Law Firm LLC requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Daubert Law Firm LLC.(Larsen, Brett)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Daubert Law Firm LLC. (Larsen, Brett)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of Daubert Law Firm LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Hanus (Hanus, David)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett B Larsen on behalf of Daubert Law Firm LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Brett B. Larsen (Larsen, Brett)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant LVNV Funding LLC requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey AL Conley on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Lindsey Conley (Conley, Lindsey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by LVNV Funding LLC.(Foster, Nabil)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by LVNV Funding LLC. (Foster, Nabil)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nabil G Foster on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Nabil G. Foster (Foster, Nabil)
September 11, 2018 DISREGARD ENTRY - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (mlm) Modified on 9/11/2018 (mlm).
September 11, 2018 Summons Issued as to Arrow Financial Services LLC, Daubert Law Firm LLC, LVNV Funding LLC. (mlm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Natalie Mizysak. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Natalie Mizysak (Attachments: #1 Summons Arrow, #2 Summons Daubert, #3 Summons LVNV)(DeLadurantey, Nathan)
September 10, 2018 Case Opening Modification: The summonses attached to the Complaint were not prepared properly - please follow the instructions and resubmit them using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading Other Documents. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, and the # summons instructions for further guidance. (lz)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Natalie Mizysak. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Arrow Financial Services LLC, Daubert Law Firm LLC, LVNV Funding LLC by Natalie Mizysak. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2916628) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Arrow Financial, #3 Summons Daubert Law Firm, #4 Summons LVNV Funding)(DeLadurantey, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizysak v. Arrow Financial Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Mizysak
Represented By: Nathan E DeLadurantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: Lindsey AL Conley
Represented By: Nabil G Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daubert Law Firm LLC
Represented By: Brett B Larsen
Represented By: David J Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?