AO Smith Corporation v. Rheem Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: A.O. Smith Corporation and AO Smith Corporation
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01405
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AO Smith Corporation re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stiehl, Jason)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Ruvinsky on behalf of AO Smith Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Nina Ruvinsky (Ruvinsky, Nina)
October 19, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blythe, Russell)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Blythe, Russell)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Blythe, Russell)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Blythe, Russell)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E Blythe on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Russell E. Blythe (Blythe, Russell)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AO Smith Corporation. Rheem Manufacturing Company served on 9/12/2018. (Stiehl, Jason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by AO Smith Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stiehl, Jason)
October 1, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed by 10/18/2018; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER: For good cause the plaintiff's consent motion is granted. Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than October 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/26/2018. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Expedited MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AO Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stiehl, Jason)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(mlm)
September 11, 2018 Summons Issued as to Rheem Manufacturing Company. (mlm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by AO Smith Corporation (Stiehl, Jason)
September 11, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (mlm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by A.O. Smith Corporation (Stiehl, Jason)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Stiehl, Jason)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Stiehl on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Jason P. Stiehl (Stiehl, Jason)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rheem Manufacturing Company by A.O. Smith Corporation. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2917156) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stiehl, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
September 10, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AO Smith Corporation v. Rheem Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Jason P Stiehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AO Smith Corporation
Represented By: Jason P Stiehl
Represented By: Nina Ruvinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Russell E Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?