Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Z's Bar LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: David Zarate, Z's Bar, LLC and Z's Bar LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01437
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 11/8/2018 ordering Plaintiff to show cause as to why it has not filed proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant as previously ordered by the Court on 9/14/2018. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
October 2, 2018 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Janis, Ryan)
September 14, 2018 3 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 09/14/2018. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. There is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
September 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 13, 2018 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Janis, Ryan)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Z's Bar, LLC, David Zarate by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2920750) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Z's Bar, LLC, #3 Summons David Zarate)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Z's Bar LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z's Bar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z's Bar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan R Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Ryan R Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?