Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Konda

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Llazar Konda
Case Number: 2:2018cv01482
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz)
November 15, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Llazar Konda. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Llazar Konda's Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Martinez, Nicholas)
November 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas K Martinez on behalf of Llazar Konda. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas Martinez (Martinez, Nicholas)
November 15, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Llazar Konda.(Martinez, Nicholas)
October 29, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Llazar Konda served on 10/24/2018. (Janis, Ryan)
October 2, 2018 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Janis, Ryan)
September 24, 2018 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright. (via US mail to Register of Copyrights). (lz)
September 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to Llazar Konda. (lz)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 21, 2018 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Janis, Ryan)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Llazar Konda by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2926778) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Llazar Konda)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Konda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Ryan R Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Llazar Konda
Represented By: Nicholas K Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?