Thong v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: Pathoumuanh Thong
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2018cv01558
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel, petitioner)(asc)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Thong's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Docket #7 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, petitioner)(asc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Warwick, Lisa)
November 9, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (blr)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
November 7, 2018 Mail Sent to Pathoumuang Thong Returned as Undeliverable re #8 Rule 4 Order. Not in custody. (blr)
October 29, 2018 TRANSMIT #8 Order and #7 Amended Petition via US mail to Warden of Kenosha County Detention Center, US Dept of Homeland Security, US Immigration & Customs Enforcement, US Dept of Justice, and US Attorney ED-WI. (blr)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall effect service of the petition and this Order upon respondent pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Petitioner) (blr)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Pathoumuanh Thong. (blr)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Pathoumuanh Thong. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Thong file an amended application for writ of habeas corpus to include grounds for relief, if any, within 21 days. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Petitioner w/ habeas form)(blr)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Pathoumuanh Thong. (blr)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Pathoumuanh Thong. (blr)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Pathoumuanh Thong. (blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thong v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pathoumuanh Thong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?