Guelig v. Wisconsin Central Ltd
Plaintiff: Michael E Guelig
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd
Case Number: 2:2018cv01654
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael E Guelig. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (LeNeave, Randal)
October 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central Ltd. (asc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Michael E Guelig. (LeNeave, Randal)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 17, 2018 DOCKETED INCORRECTLY NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) Modified on 10/18/2018 (jcl).
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Wisconsin Central Ltd by Michael E Guelig. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2946654) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guelig v. Wisconsin Central Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Guelig
Represented By: Randal W LeNeave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?