Reyna v. Klemann et al
Plaintiff: Richard J Reyna, Sr
Defendant: Sgt Durrant, John F Matz, Judge Bissett, Jay Klemann, Barbara Key, Scott Wold, Michelle Davis, Jill Ellis and Judge Mark Slate
Case Number: 2:2018cv01758
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Referring Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/27/18. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an amended complaint on or before 1/9/19. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Richard Reyna, Sr.)(Griesbach, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER from Richard J Reyna, Sr. (tlf)
December 19, 2018 Copy of Order #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Richard Reyna (cav)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying re #13 Letter requesting refund. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER from the plaintiff regarding his funds in his account. (cms) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/19/2018 with pages corrected)
December 13, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $46.56, receipt number GB4689-4689005346; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (lh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/10/18. Reyna's #2 Motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. The complaint submitted on 11/6/18 is STRICKEN. Reyna is directed to file an amended complaint on or before 1/9/19. Failure to file an amended complaint within this time period may result in dismissal of this action. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Richard J. Reyna, Sr. and the Officer in Charge) (Griesbach, William)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard J Reyna, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(cms)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that within 21 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 46.56 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Richard Reyna and Officer in Charge)(Griesbach, William)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff regarding inventory (jcl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 Partial Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard J Reyna, Sr. (cms)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 ATTACHMENTS by Richard J Reyna, Sr re #1 Complaint - Prisoner. (cms)
November 21, 2018 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent (copy mailed to Plaintiff). (kah)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff regarding the Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form and trust account statement. (kah)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Richard J Reyna, Sr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Mr. Reyna requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 21 days, along with a six month trust account statement. (kah)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 ATTACHMENTS by Richard J Reyna, Sr re #1 Complaint - Prisoner. (kah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Richard J Reyna, Sr. (kah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 STRICKEN - See #12 Order. PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Judge Bissett, Michelle Davis, Sgt Durrant, Jill Ellis, Barbara Key, Jay Klemann, John F Matz, Mark Slate, Scott Wold by Richard J Reyna, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (kah) Modified on 12/11/2018 (mac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyna v. Klemann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Bissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Klemann
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mark Slate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Reyna, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?