Petersen et al v. Diversey Inc et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare, Christine Petersen and Alex M Azar, II
Defendant: Cintas Corporation #2, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, XYZ Insurance Company, Diversey Inc, Sealed Air Corporation and ABC Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01766
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Mullin, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 DISREGARD; WRONG DOCUMENT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Mullin, Daniel) Modified on 11/16/2018 (kah).
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sealed Air Corporation. (Donnelly, Patrick)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Diversey Inc. (Donnelly, Patrick)
November 16, 2018 DISREGARD; FILED at #1 -5 and #1 -6 NOTICE to DEFENDANTS Sealed Air Corporation and Diversey Inc - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (blr) Modified on 11/16/2018 (blr).
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Diversey Inc.(Donnelly, Patrick)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Sealed Air Corporation.(Donnelly, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cintas Corporation #2. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Cintas Corporation #2 of Consent to Removal (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Cintas Corporation #2. (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomislav Z Kuzmanovic on behalf of Cintas Corporation #2. Attorney(s) appearing: Tomislav Z. Kuzmanovic (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Consent to Removal (Mullin, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Mullin on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel Mullin (Mullin, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diversey Inc, Sealed Air Corporation (Donnelly, Patrick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G Donnelly on behalf of Sealed Air Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick G. Donnelly (Donnelly, Patrick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G Donnelly on behalf of Diversey Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick G. Donnelly (Donnelly, Patrick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversey Inc, Sealed Air Corporation from Walworth County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2018cv000615 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2964586) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Diversey's Disclosure Statement Exhibit, #6 Sealed Air's Disclosure Statement Exhibit)(Donnelly, Patrick) Modified on 11/16/2018 (blr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen et al v. Diversey Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation #2
Represented By: Tomislav Z Kuzmanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversey Inc
Represented By: Patrick G Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Air Corporation
Represented By: Patrick G Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Petersen
Represented By: Kathryn P Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Kathryn P Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?