Shukla et al v. Leopold et al

Plaintiff: Avi Shukla and Vishal Shukla
Defendant: Kirstjen Michele Nielsen, Matthew Krueger, Kay Leopold, Mirash Dedvukaj, Donald Neufeld and L Francis Cissna
Case Number: 2:2018cv01826
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
December 7, 2018 Docket Annotation - Plaintiffs' attorney's office called to confirm the Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form (ECF No #5 ) is the correct document.(lz)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Vishal Shukla, Avi Shukla ; This document does not match the docket entry. The event chosen was Disclosure Statement but the document is a Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Please inform the Clerk's Office which document you intended to file and/or REFILE the correct document.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs (Lotfi, Shabnam) Modified on 12/6/2018 (vkb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Lotfi, Shabnam)
November 21, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 11/21/18. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the petition or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
November 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to L Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kay Leopold, Donald Neufeld, Kirstjen Michele Nielsen, Matthew Krueger. (kah)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Lotfi, Shabnam)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mandamus against All Defendants by Vishal Shukla, Avi Shukla. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2972644)(Lotfi, Shabnam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shukla et al v. Leopold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Michele Nielsen
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Krueger
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Leopold
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avi Shukla
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vishal Shukla
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?