Vang v. Midland Funding, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kou Vang
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, Kohn Law Firm, S.C. and Kohn Law Firm SC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01915
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kohn Law Firm SC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ambrosh, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kohn Law Firm SC. (Ambrosh, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kohn Law Firm SC.(Ambrosh, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Ambrosh on behalf of Kohn Law Firm SC. Attorney(s) appearing: David A. Ambrosh (Ambrosh, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Funding, LLC.(Armstrong, Bradley)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/29/19 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Midland Funding, LLC answer due 1/31/2019. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Bradley)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/7/19 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Midland Funding, LLC. Answer due 1/25/2019. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Midland Funding, LLC. (Armstrong, Bradley)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Midland Funding, LLC. (Armstrong, Bradley)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Armstrong on behalf of Midland Funding, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Bradley R. Armstrong (Armstrong, Bradley)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kou Vang. Midland Funding, LLC served on 12/14/2018. (Pagel, Briane)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kohn Law Firm, S.C. - Waiver sent on 12/7/2018. (Pagel, Briane)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jcl)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Kou Vang. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2983060) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet FINAL Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Request for Defendant, Midland Funding LLC, #3 Summons Summons Request for Defendant, Kohn Law Firm, S.C.)(Pagel, Briane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vang v. Midland Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Bradley R Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohn Law Firm, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohn Law Firm SC
Represented By: David A Ambrosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kou Vang
Represented By: Briane F Pagel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?