Crescent Electric Supply Company v. Coates Electric LLC et al

Plaintiff: Crescent Electric Supply Company
Defendant: Brody Coates and Coates Electric LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01920
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 1/25/2019. (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (nb)
January 22, 2019 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Crescent Electric Supply Company. (Conard, Bennett)
January 22, 2019 9 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Brody Coates, Coates Electric LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Tokarz, Brian)
January 10, 2019 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Crescent Electric Supply Company re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Conard, Bennett)
January 4, 2019 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 1/22/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
January 3, 2019 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew V Fisher on behalf of Brody Coates, Coates Electric LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew V. Fisher (Fisher, Matthew)
December 27, 2018 5 BRIEF in Support filed by Brody Coates, Coates Electric LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Terms and Conditions)(Tokarz, Brian)
December 27, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Brody Coates, Coates Electric LLC. (Tokarz, Brian)
December 27, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Tokarz on behalf of Brody Coates, Coates Electric LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian C. Tokarz (Tokarz, Brian)
December 21, 2018 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Crescent Electric Supply Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Conard, Bennett)
December 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
December 7, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Crescent Electric Supply Company by Crescent Electric Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Complaint Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Information Sheet Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Conard, Bennett) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/7/2018) (asc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crescent Electric Supply Company v. Coates Electric LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brody Coates
Represented By: Brian C Tokarz
Represented By: Matthew V Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coates Electric LLC
Represented By: Brian C Tokarz
Represented By: Matthew V Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crescent Electric Supply Company
Represented By: Bennett Joseph Conard
Represented By: Nathan S Fronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?