Vanselow v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Zane Vanselow
Defendant: McKesson Corporation and Midwest Area Physicians LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01942
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by McKesson Corporation.(Noyes, Kelly)
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER from J. Craig Jones . (Jones, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John Craig Jones on behalf of Zane Vanselow. Attorney(s) appearing: J. Craig Jones (Jones, John)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L Stedman on behalf of Midwest Area Physicians LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily L. Stedman (Stedman, Emily)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 01/04/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 2/20/19 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Conley on behalf of Midwest Area Physicians LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel E. Conley (Conley, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Midwest Area Physicians LLC.(Shortridge, Alexandra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Midwest Area Physicians LLC. (Shortridge, Alexandra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra W Shortridge on behalf of Midwest Area Physicians LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Alexandra W. Shortridge (Shortridge, Alexandra)
January 2, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (kah)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by McKesson Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Noyes, Kelly)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Welcenbach, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by McKesson Corporation.(Noyes, Kelly)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C Borison on behalf of Zane Vanselow. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott C. Borison (Borison, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/14/18 GRANTING Oral Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/14/18. McKesson Corporation has, consistent with this Court's Case Management and Scheduling Guidance, requested an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. According to McKesson, Plaintiff does not object to this request. It is therefore GRANTED. McKesson Corporation's answer is now due 12/28/2018. NOTE: There is no document attached to this text-only order. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
December 14, 2018 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time (made pursuant to Judge's Case Management and Scheduling Guidance) by McKesson Corporation. (kah)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Lovern on behalf of McKesson Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan E. Lovern (Lovern, Susan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Noyes, Kelly)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Tammy Tate . (Noyes, Kelly)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michele Lau on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Noyes, Kelly)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKesson Corporation from Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2018CV009170 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2985458) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Noyes, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanselow v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane Vanselow
Represented By: Robert J Welcenbach
Represented By: John Craig Jones
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Sara A Ford
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Area Physicians LLC
Represented By: Alexandra W Shortridge
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Represented By: Emily L Stedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?