Packer v. Litscher et al

Plaintiff: Kesha S Packer
Defendant: Niel Thoreson, Denise Symdon, Wisconsin Division of Community Corrections and Jon E Litscher
Case Number: 2:2018cv02024
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 FILING FEE Received: $400.00, receipt number MK4689-076049. (jcl)
January 29, 2019 INCORRECT EVENT USED INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $400.00, receipt number MK4689-MK4689-076049. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl) Modified on 1/29/2019 (jcl).
January 16, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (via US mail to Plaintiff) (blr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kesha S Packer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee by January 28, 2019. Failure to pay the filing fee by January 28, 2019 will result in this action being dismissed. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff) (blr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kesha S Packer. (blr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kesha S Packer. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Packer v. Litscher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesha S Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niel Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Symdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Division of Community Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon E Litscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?