Thompson v. Frede et al

Plaintiff: Gregory J Thompson and Gregory A Thompson
Defendant: VentureSpace LLC, Encompass Realty LLC, VS Capitol Drive LLC, Michael J Frede, Daniel J Marks, Konigin Developments LLC, VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC, Andrea Johnson and Michael D Frede
Case Number: 2:2018cv02036
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Case Terminated - Certified copy of the docket and #23 Order Granting Motion to Remand sent via First Class mail to the Waukesha County Circuit Court (vkb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/23/2019 REMANDING CASE to Waukesha County Circuit Court. #4 Defendants' MOTION to Remand to State Court GRANTED. #17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Gregory Thompson)(cb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 22 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Daniel J Marks, VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hofbauer, Thomas)
January 23, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Encompass Realty LLC, Andrea Johnson, Konigin Developments LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Deutch, Alan)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #18 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC and Daniel J Marks; Document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge (Judge Jones). This document must be RE-FILED. (vkb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 Amended Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael D Frede. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McClure, Thomas) Modified on 1/23/2019 (vkb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 RE-FILED as #20 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael D Frede (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McClure, Thomas) Modified on 1/23/2019 (vkb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 DOCUMENT to be RE-FILED Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Daniel J Marks, VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hofbauer, Thomas) Modified on 1/23/2019 (vkb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Answers and REQUEST for Entry of Default filed by plaintiff Gregory A Thompson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(vkb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS by Daniel J Marks, VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC to Removal. (Hofbauer, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Daniel J Marks, VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC.(Hofbauer, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C Hofbauer on behalf of Daniel J Marks, VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas C. Hofbauer (Hofbauer, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by VentureSpace LLC. (McClure, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Frede, VentureSpace, VS Capitol Drive and Frede Trust ANSWER to Complaint by Michael D Frede.(McClure, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Encompass Realty LLC, Andrea Johnson, Konigin Developments LLC re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Objecting to Removal/Supporting Remand. (McAlister, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Encompass Realty LLC, Konigin Developments LLC. (McAlister, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James L McAlister on behalf of Encompass Realty LLC, Andrea Johnson, Konigin Developments LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: James L McAlister (McAlister, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Encompass Realty LLC, Andrea Johnson, Konigin Developments LLC.(McAlister, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by plaintiff Gregory A Thompson re #4 defendants' MOTION to Remand to State Court (vkb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D Frede (McClure, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Proposed Order Remanding Removed Case To Original State Court (McClure, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael D Frede. (McClure, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff requesting that the report on copyright form be filed (vkb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cms)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VentureSpace LLC, Michael J Frede, VS Capitol Drive LLC from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18cv2154 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2999696) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A State Court file, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A continued, #4 Removal Notice Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties)(McClure, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Frede et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VentureSpace LLC
Represented By: Thomas J McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Realty LLC
Represented By: James L McAlister
Represented By: Alan H Deutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VS Capitol Drive LLC
Represented By: Thomas J McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Frede
Represented By: Thomas J McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J Marks
Represented By: Thomas C Hofbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konigin Developments LLC
Represented By: James L McAlister
Represented By: Alan H Deutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VentureSpace Condominium Association-Sussex LLC
Represented By: Thomas C Hofbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Johnson
Represented By: James L McAlister
Represented By: Alan H Deutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Frede
Represented By: Thomas J McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?