Bond v. Sutton et al
Plaintiff: Brandy Bond
Defendant: Maggie Sutton, Waukesha Protective Services and Waukesha School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00029
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/13/2019. Action DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Brandy Bond)(jm)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/13/2019: OVERRULING #6 Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph's Report and Recommendation; ADOPTING #5 Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph's Report and Recommendation, and DISMISSING CASE. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Brandy Bond)(jm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS by Brandy Bond re #5 Report and Recommendations (asc) Modified on 1/18/2019 (asc).
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph re #1 Complaint. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this case be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (continued below...) (blr)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brandy Bond. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Brandy Bond. (asc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Brandy Bond. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond v. Sutton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waukesha Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waukesha School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?