Ward v. Farrell et al
Plaintiff: Quentin C Ward
Defendant: Patricia A Kraus, Gregory Nowakoski, Patricia D McMahon, William Herold, Paul L Tiffin, Cynthia A Lozano, Dean B Zemel and Leslie A Farrell
Case Number: 2:2019cv00082
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/19/2019. Action DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Quentin C. Ward at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(jm)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/19/2019: DENYING as moot #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Change Venue and to Clarify and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Quentin C. Ward at Green Bay Correctional Institution) (jm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from the Clerk to Quentin C Ward regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue to Milwaukee, MOTION to Clarify that this case is not subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act by Quentin C Ward. (tlf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Quentin C Ward. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (tlf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/17/2019 DENYING #2 Plaintiff Quentin C Ward's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. If Ward wants to proceed with this case, he must pay the $400 filing fee by February 8, 2019. If Ward does not pay the filing fee by the deadline, the court will dismiss this case without prejudice and without further notice to him. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
January 17, 2019 DUE TO NON CONSENT Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (lz)
January 17, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Plaintiff. (lz)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Quentin Ward re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form and trust account statement be filed within 21 days (mac)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Quentin C Ward. (mac)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Quentin C Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Farrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Nowakoski
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia D McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L Tiffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean B Zemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie A Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin C Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?