Whyte v. Hepp
Plaintiff: Jacob S Whyte
Defendant: John Maggloncalada, Steven L Sisbach, Chris Krueger, C Whitman, W Weisensel, Steve Bethke, Randall Hepp, Robert Franks, T Kiser, David Borkhahn, Jon Litscher and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00123
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Laure C Rakvic-Farr on behalf of Randall Hepp. Attorney(s) appearing: Laure Rakvic-Farr (Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Randall Hepp. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Flugaur, Brandon)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Randall Hepp (Flugaur, Brandon)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T Flugaur on behalf of Randall Hepp. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon T. Flugaur (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flugaur, Brandon)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Whyte's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Jon Litscher, Chris Krueger, John Maggloncalada, Bethke, T. Kiser, C. Whitman, Robert Franks, John and Jane Does 1-10, Steven L. Sisbach, W. Weisensel, and David Borkhahn are DISMISSED as defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to an informal service agreement between the Wisconsin Department of Justice and this court, copies of Whytes complaint and this order are being electronically sent today to the Wisconsin Department of Justice for service on the state defendant Warden Randall Hepp (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (asc)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Jacob S Whyte re #5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (asc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Jacob S Whyte. New address is 18534 Blair Street, Whitehall, WI 54773. (asc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jacob S Whyte. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph that on or before February 14, 2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $14.13 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff & Sheriff)(blr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jacob S Whyte. (blr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jacob S Whyte. (blr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Jacob S Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whyte v. Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maggloncalada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L Sisbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Weisensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bethke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Hepp
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Borkhahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Litscher
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob S Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?