Cheema v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Laquentia Cheema
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00214
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due 6/5/19; Defendant's response due 7/15/19; Plaintiff's reply due 7/30/19. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 2/22/2019. (blr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/21/2019. (blr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nancy Berryhill. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
February 13, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/13/19 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The file will be returned to the Clerk of Courts for service on defendant. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Laquentia Cheema. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Laquentia Cheema. (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Laquentia Cheema. (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Laquentia Cheema (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drexler-Dreis, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheema v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquentia Cheema
Represented By: Leah A Drexler-Dreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?