Hammer v. Hamilton et al

Plaintiff: Troy G Hammer
Defendant: Dr Samantha Schwartz-Oscar and Dr Todd Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00216
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: William E Duffin
1 Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED Amended Complaint filed by Troy G Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mac)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Brief in Opposition by Troy G Hammer. (mac)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/10/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Hammer's motion to appoint counsel (ECF No. #15 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The defendants must supplement their motion to dismiss (ECF No. #13 ) consistent with the instructions in this decision by May 13, 2019. Hammer's response to the motion and supplement is due June 17, 2019. If the defendants want to file a reply brief, they must do so by July 1, 2019. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (mlm)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER from Troy Hammer regarding procedure, status of pending motions and request for copy of complaint filed in this action. (lh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Troy G Hammer. (lh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Troy G Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Misc. Letters and Response from Counsel)(lh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Todd Hamilton, Samantha Schwartz-Oscar re #13 MOTION to Dismiss . (Held, Eliot)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Hamilton, Samantha Schwartz-Oscar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliot M Held on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Eliot M. Held (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to All Defendants (Bachhuber, Rachel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Bachhuber on behalf of Todd Hamilton, Samantha Schwartz-Oscar. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel L. Bachhuber (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bachhuber, Rachel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from regarding initial partial filing fee (fee was received on 2/25/19). Copy of docket mailed to plaintiff on 3/6/19. (lh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from the plaintiff inquiring where to send his initial partial payment and requesting copies. Mailed copies. (cms)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by Troy G Hammer. The WI DOJ is directed to collect the balance of the filing fee in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Defendants are to file a responsive pleading within 60 days. Case referred to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for Pretrial Case Management. Signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/1/2019. (cc: all counsel via CM/ECF and by U.S. Mail to Troy G Hammer and Warden Susan Novak (CCI))(Griesbach, William)
February 25, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $25.51, receipt number GB4689-5398; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (lh)
February 15, 2019 DUE TO NON CONSENT Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Troy G Hammer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/12/2019 that on or before 3/6/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 25.51 as an initial partial filing fee. If plaintiff does not wish to proceed with this action to avoid incurring a "strike" under 28 USC 1915(g) or does not wish to pay the filing fee as set forth in this Order, he must notify the court by filing a letter with the Clerk of Court on or before March 6, 2019. If on or before March 6, 2019, Hammer fails to make the initial partial payment or show cause for failing to do so, he will be held to have withdrawn this action voluntarily and the case will be closed without prejudice to Hammer filing this case at a later date. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden - Columbia Corr Inst)(lz)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Troy G. Hammer re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Troy G Hammer. (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Troy G Hammer. (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Todd Hamilton, Samantha Schwartz-Oscar by Troy G Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Certification as to dismissals)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammer v. Hamilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Samantha Schwartz-Oscar
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Todd Hamilton
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy G Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?