PS Funding Inc v. QAZ LLC et al

Plaintiff: PS Funding Inc
Defendant: Leanne Springstron, CRS LLC, Helen Chou, CSL Holdings LLC and QAZ LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00222
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by PS Funding Inc Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice (Waldman, Damian)
March 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by PS Funding Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Waldman, Damian)
February 12, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by PS Funding Inc civil cover sheet. (Waldman, Damian)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by PS Funding Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3030294) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Waldman, Damian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PS Funding Inc v. QAZ LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Springstron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QAZ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PS Funding Inc
Represented By: Damian G Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?