Rice v. Reading For Education LLC

Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Defendant: Reading For Education LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00245
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jcl)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Mark Rice re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Certificate of Service)(jcl)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Reading For Education LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Urness, Thor)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by Reading For Education LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Materials)(Urness, Thor)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Reading For Education LLC. (Urness, Thor)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Reading For Education LLC. (Urness, Thor)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Rice. Reading For Education LLC served on 2/28/2019. (jcl)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (jcl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mark Rice. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Reading For Education LLC filed by Mark Rice. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Joseph. Jury Demand (Filing Fee PAID ; MK46889-076369) (Service Packet Issued) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Reading For Education LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reading For Education LLC
Represented By: Thor Y Urness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?