Tackett v. Jess et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Greg Tackett
Defendant: Jessica Bassuener, Julie Ludwig, Sherri Pulda, Sgt Lyyski, Candice Whitman, L. LeBlanc, L Bartow, Randall Hepp, Dr Kevin Krembs, J Aldana, Charles Larson, Greg Burmeister, Paul Kemper, Kristen Vasquez, Cathy Jess, M. Schomisch, G. Bornick, Gwen Hodges, L Alsum, Laura Frazier, Jon Litscher, E Davidson, Roxanne Lyyski, Lori Alsum, M Schomisch, Lonel LeBlanc, Emily Davidson, Laura Bartow and Glenn Bornick
Case Number: 2:2019cv00258
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/28/2019: DENYING as moot #72 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; DENYING #74 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and DENYING #77 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Timothy Gregg Tackett at Fox Lake Correctional Institution) (jm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Julie Ludwig (Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Candace Whitman (Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Lori Alsum (Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Laura Bartow (Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Laura Frazier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1013- CORRESPONDENCE TO VASQUEZ)(Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Emily Davidson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1007- ICRS HISTORY, #2 Exhibit 1008- FLCI-2017-27258, #3 Exhibit 1009- FLCI-2017-28392, #4 Exhibit 1010- FLCI-2017-29750, #5 Exhibit 1011- FLCI-2018-16763, #6 Exhibit 1012- FLCI-2018-18640)(Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Roxanne Lyyski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1005- PERSONAL PROPERTY LOG, #2 Exhibit 1006- DAI POLICY 309.20.03)(Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Kevin Krembs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1002- HSU RECORD EXCERPT, #2 Exhibit 1003- DAI POLICY 500.30.02, #3 Exhibit 1004- DAI POLICY 500.10.12)(Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Gwen McGillivray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1001- NOTICE OF CLAIM, #2 Exhibit 1014- NOTICE OF CLAIM)(Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 85 Proposed Findings of Fact by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman (Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 84 BRIEF in Support filed by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss . (Held, Eliot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 8/23/2019 (blr).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/16/2019 GRANTING #82 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Summary Judgment Motions now due by 8/22/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Timothy Greg Tackett at Fox Lake Correctional Institution) (jm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
August 8, 2019 Filing 81 Interim Settlement Report from Laure Rakvic-Farr . This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
August 8, 2019 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Laure Rakvic-Farr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1000 - July 29, 2019 Letter)(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
August 8, 2019 Filing 79 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman re #74 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
August 5, 2019 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Timothy Greg Tackett (asc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 77 FOURTH MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Timothy Greg Tackett. (asc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Timothy Greg Tackett (asc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #1 Exhibit 701) (asc).
July 29, 2019 Filing 75 BRIEF in Support filed by Timothy Greg Tackett re #74 MOTION to Compel. (asc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 74 THIRD MOTION to Compel by Timothy Greg Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/18/2019 DENYING #70 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Use Release Account for Filing Fee Payments. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Timothy Greg Tackett at Fox Lake Correctional Institution) (jm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Timothy Greg Tackett. (asc)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/13/2019: DENYING #47 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; DENYING #52 Plaintiff's Motion for Early Neutral Evaluation; DENYING #55 Plaintiff's Motion for Specification of Oral Depositions; DENYING as moot #57 and #61 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel; and DENYING #65 Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Matters Admitted. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Timothy Greg Tackett at Fox Lake Correctional Institution) (jm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Order Allowing for Filing Fee Payments Made from Release Account by Timothy Greg Tackett. Mailed copy of docket to plaintiff. (asc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman re #65 MOTION . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot)
May 9, 2019 Filing 68 DISCOVERY document filed by Timothy Greg Tackett.(asc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Timothy Greg Tackett re #57 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE re Subpoena by Timothy Greg Tackett (asc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Deem Matters Admitted by Timothy Greg Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits)(asc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 64 REQUEST by Timothy Greg Tackett for Four signed subpoenas. (Mailed signed subpoenas to plaintiff via USPS) (asc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Timothy Greg Tackett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(asc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 62 BRIEF in Support filed by Timothy Greg Tackett re #61 SECOND MOTION to Compel. (asc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 61 SECOND MOTION to Compel by Timothy Greg Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 60 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman re #57 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
April 30, 2019 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Timothy Greg Tackett (asc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 58 BRIEF in Support filed by Timothy Greg Tackett re #57 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(asc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Timothy Greg Tackett. (asc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Lori Alsum, Laura Bartow, Glenn Bornick, Emily Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, Lonel LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Roxanne Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman re #55 MOTION for Order . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot)
April 18, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Specification of Oral Depositions by Timothy Greg Tackett. (asc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 54 REQUEST by Timothy Greg Tackett for copy of docket. (Mailed copy of docket via USPS) (asc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 53 REQUEST for a signed subpoena by Timothy Greg Tackett. (Mailed issued subpoena to plaintiff via USPS) (asc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Early Neutral Evaluation by Timothy Greg Tackett. (asc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Subpoena by Timothy Greg Tackett (Attachments: #1 Copy of Subpoena)(asc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 50 REQUEST for Admissions by Timothy Greg Tackett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing)(blr)
March 21, 2019 Filing 49 SECOND REQUEST for Production of Documents and INTERROGATORIES by Timothy Greg Tackett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(asc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 48 REQUEST for Two Subpoenas by Timothy Greg Tackett. (mailed two signed subpoenas to plaintiff) (asc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE Regarding Discovery mailed to plaintiff (asc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Timothy Greg Tackett. (asc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 45 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Timothy Greg Tackett(asc)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/12/2019: Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2019; Motions to Dismiss due by 5/10/2019; Discovery to be completed by 7/25/2019; Interim Settlement Report due by 8/8/2019; Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/15/2019. Dates for trial, other relevant pretrial deadlines, and final settlement report to be set as necessary. See Order for further details. (Attachments: #1 Rules and Guides) (cc: all counsel, via mail to Timothy Greg Tackett at Fox Lake Correctional Institution)(jm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 43 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Timothy Greg Tackett. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
February 27, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent (copy mailed to Plaintiff). (kah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Greg Tackett (kah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 41 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Timothy Greg Tackett. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(kah)
February 25, 2019 Filing 40 LETTER and DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Timothy Greg Tackett (docket mailed - address changed to Fox Lake Correctional). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 21 days. (kah)
February 20, 2019 Filing 38 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by L Alsum, L Bartow, G. Bornick, E Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 19, 2019 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-00224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Transfer to Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 02/15/2019. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 35 Brief in Reply by Defendants L. Alsum, L. Bartow, G. Bornick, E. Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman in Support of #33 Motion to Transfer, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #33 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin. Brief in Reply due 2/8/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett re: #33 Motion to Transfer, filed by Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Laura Frazier, G. Bornick, Kristen Vasquez, Kevin Krembs, E. Davidson, Candice Whitman, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Cathy Jess, L. Alsum, Paul Kemper, L. Bartow. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #33 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin . Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 1/31/2019. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 2/7/2019. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendants L. Alsum, L. Bartow, G. Bornick, E. Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman, (Attachments: #1 Judicial Caseload Profile) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps) Modified on 1/18/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendants L. Alsum, L. Bartow, G. Bornick, E. Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 31 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 30 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants L. Alsum, L. Bartow, G. Bornick, E. Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman. (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance filed by Laure C. Rakvic-Farr for Defendants L. Alsum, L. Bartow, G. Bornick, E. Davidson, Laura Frazier, Cathy Jess, Paul Kemper, Kevin Krembs, Charles Larson, L. LeBlanc, Julie Ludwig, Lyyski, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 28 Letter from Clerk of Court re #27 . (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 27 Letter Requesting Copies of Summary Judgement Procedure and Guide for Litigants Without a Lawyer by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants L. Alsum, Kristen Vasquez, Candice Whitman, G. Bornick, L. Bartow, Julie Ludwig, L. LeBlanc, Kevin Krembs, E. Davidson, Cathy Jess, Charles Larson, Lyyski, Laura Frazier, Paul Kemper. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Randall Hepp, Gwen Hodges, Jon Litscher, Sherri Pulda, M. Schomisch, J. Aldana and Greg Burmeister. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/19/2018. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 25 Letter from clerk's office in response to #24 Letter Requesting Verification of Receipt of Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 24 Letter Requesting Verification of Receipt of Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelopes 1-5) (nln),(ps) Modified on 11/19/2018 (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting plaintiff's #20 motion for leave to supplement his amended complaint; denying plaintiff's #4 motion for assistance in recruiting counsel. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. Plaintiff may have until September 4, 2018, to file an amended complaint Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 21 Letter from clerk's office in response to cover letter submitted with #20 Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 20 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Charles Larson, #2 Summons as to Roger Kranz, #3 Cover Letter and Envelope) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 19 Clerk's office response to #18 letter from plaintiff. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 18 Letter from plaintiff Timothy Tackett enclosing $2.40 payment for copies referenced in #17 clerk's office letter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 17 Clerk's office response to #15 letter from plaintiff. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 16 Supplement / Disbursement Request to #15 Letter re: $2.40 payment for copies, filed by Plaintiff Timothy Tackett. (Attachments: #1 remittance slip for copies, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 15 Letter from plaintiff Timothy Tackett requesting confirmation of receipt of $75.40 initial partial payment and $2.40 payment to cover copy costs referenced at #13 letter; and providing update on surgery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 14 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Partial Filing fee received: $75.40, receipt number 34690031636. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from clerk's office in response to #12 Letter Requesting Copies of Exhibits. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 12 Letter Requesting Copies of Exhibits filed with original Complaint by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Timothy G. Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendants Bassuener and Lyyski) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 75.40 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 4/24/2018. Plaintiff's motion for use of release account funds to pay the entire filing fee in this case (Dkt. #7 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/2/2018. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration of Timothy G. Tackett re: #4 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 5 Brief in Support of #4 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Timothy G. Tackett. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 3 Exhibit R / Declaration of Joseph Knigge re: #1 Complaint filed by plaintiff Timothy Tackett. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibit Q / Declaration of Clifford Boland re: #1 Complaint filed by plaintiff Timothy Tackett. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy G. Tackett. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-P - Inmate complaint documents; FLCI-2017-29750, #2 Exhibit S - Letter from plaintiff, 4/23/16, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (jef) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2018: #5 Summonses) (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 2/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tackett v. Jess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bassuener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ludwig
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Pulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Lyyski
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Whitman
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. LeBlanc
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Bartow
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Kevin Krembs
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Larson
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Burmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kemper
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Vasquez
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Schomisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Bornick
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Alsum
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Frazier
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Litscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Davidson
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Lyyski
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Alsum
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Schomisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonel LeBlanc
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Davidson
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Bartow
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Bornick
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Greg Tackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?