Williams et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: David B. Williams, Kathleen E. Williams, David B Williams and Kathleen E Williams
Defendant: Rob Gross, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Joe O'Grady
Case Number: 2:2019cv00301
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company re #11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 9(b) . (Devilling, Brian)
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Rob Gross, Joe O'Grady re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Devilling, Brian)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/11/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 9/20/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 1/13/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 1/17/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 1/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(km)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Rob Gross, Joe O'Grady, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Devilling, Brian)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion filed by David B Williams, Kathleen E Williams re #11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 9(b) . (Leib, Brenden)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion filed by David B Williams, Kathleen E Williams re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Leib, Brenden)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J P Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 3/22/2019 (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (km)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Devilling, Brian)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Leib, Brenden)
March 14, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Devilling, Brian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Devilling, Brian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rob Gross, Joe O'Grady. (Devilling, Brian)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Devilling, Brian)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenden M Leib on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Brenden M. Leib (Leib, Brenden)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/7/2019 GRANTING #6 Defendants' Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 3/13/2019. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Plead (Unopposed) by All Defendants. (Devilling, Brian)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 DISREGARD; SEE #6 MOTION MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by All Defendants. (Devilling, Brian) Modified on 3/7/2019 (asc).
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/19/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Ponzi on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Ponzi (Ponzi, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Devilling on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian E. Devilling (Devilling, Brian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rob Gross, Joe O'Grady, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Circuit Court, Walworth County, Case Number: 2019cv000042 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3042135) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate)(Devilling, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Gross
Represented By: Matthew S Ponzi
Represented By: Brian E Devilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S Ponzi
Represented By: Brian E Devilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe O'Grady
Represented By: Matthew S Ponzi
Represented By: Brian E Devilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Williams
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Brenden M Leib
Represented By: Sean M Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen E. Williams
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Brenden M Leib
Represented By: Sean M Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B Williams
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Brenden M Leib
Represented By: Sean M Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen E Williams
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Brenden M Leib
Represented By: Sean M Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?