Securities and Exchange Commission v. Armbruster et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Bret Naggs, Mark Wogsland and Peter Armbruster
Intervenor: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2019cv00481
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/28/19 granting #19 Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/28/19 granting #21 Motion to Intervene. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Joining Motion to Stay SEC Proceedings Pending Entry of Final Judgment in Parallel Criminal Case by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottingham, Caitlin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin R Cottingham on behalf of United States Department of Justice. Attorney(s) appearing: Caitlin R. Cottingham (Cottingham, Caitlin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay SEC PROCEEDING PENDING OUTCOME OF PARALLEL CRIMINAL CASE by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biskupic, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley N Lewis on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Brad Lewis (Lewis, Bradley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mark Wogsland. (Hedges, Ryan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bret Naggs. (Eisenmann, Vanessa)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Peter Armbruster. (DeVooght, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bret Naggs - Waiver sent on 4/3/2019. (Jacobs, Michelle)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Wogsland - Waiver sent on 4/3/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Armbruster - Waiver sent on 4/3/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S Hedges on behalf of Mark Wogsland. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan S. Hedges (Hedges, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Junaid A Zubairi on behalf of Mark Wogsland. Attorney(s) appearing: Junaid A. Zubairi (Zubairi, Junaid)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon P Reinisch on behalf of Mark Wogsland. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathon P. Reinisch (Reinisch, Jonathon)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by C Linna Chen on behalf of Peter Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: C. Linna Chen (Chen, C)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R DeVooght on behalf of Peter Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew R. DeVooght (DeVooght, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/4/2019. Judge Pamela Pepper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa K Eisenmann on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Vanessa K. Eisenmann (Eisenmann, Vanessa)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L Jacobs on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Michelle L. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michelle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Biskupic on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven M. Biskupic (Biskupic, Steven)
April 3, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (ds)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Leiman on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy S. Leiman (Leiman, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Peter Armbruster, Bret Naggs, Mark Wogsland by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leiman, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Armbruster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Naggs
Represented By: Steven M Biskupic
Represented By: Michelle L Jacobs
Represented By: Vanessa K Eisenmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wogsland
Represented By: Junaid A Zubairi
Represented By: Jonathon P Reinisch
Represented By: Ryan S Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Armbruster
Represented By: Andrew R DeVooght
Represented By: C Linna Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Timothy S Leiman
Represented By: Aleah Borghard
Represented By: Bradley N Lewis
Represented By: Brian D Fagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Caitlin R Cottingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?