Pritchett v. Kenosha Community Health Center Inc
Plaintiff: Dominique Pritchett
Defendant: Kenosha Community Health Center Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00656
Filed: May 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Mediation signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 7/3/2019. Mediation scheduled for August 20, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 253. PLEASE SEE ORDER for additional deadlines and instructions. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/3/19 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for Mediation signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/2/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Kenosha Community Health Center Inc. (Kaiser, Casey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey M Kaiser on behalf of Kenosha Community Health Center Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Casey M. Kaiser (Kaiser, Casey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A Lindner on behalf of Kenosha Community Health Center Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura A. Lindner (Lindner, Laura)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominique Pritchett. Kenosha Community Health Center Inc served on 6/14/2019. (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kenosha Community Health Center Inc. (bx)
May 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Dominique Pritchett (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 6, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The jury demand has been modified - please remember to verify that a jury demand is included in the initiating document. The nature of suit has been modified. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
May 6, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
May 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Kenosha Community Health Center, Inc. by Dominique Pritchett. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3101365) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discrimination complaint with Wisconsin ERD, #2 Exhibit B - Retaliation Complaint with Wisconsin ERD, #3 Exhibit C - Right to Sue Letter from EEOC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchett v. Kenosha Community Health Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Pritchett
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Community Health Center Inc
Represented By: Laura A Lindner
Represented By: Casey M Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?