Grandberry v. SL Harbour Village, LLC

Plaintiff: James Grandberry
Defendant: SL Harbour Village, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00689
Filed: May 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/24/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 7/30/19 at 11:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by SL Harbour Village, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Determination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Elizabeth A. Odian, #4 Exhibit A - ERD Investigation Index File, #5 Exhibit B - Email from Heidi Marshall dtd 05-30-19)(Odian, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by SL Harbour Village, LLC. (Odian, Elizabeth)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/12/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by SL Harbour Village, LLC. (Odian, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Grandberry. SL Harbour Village, LLC served on 5/21/2019. (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to SL Harbour Village, LLC. (jcl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James Grandberry. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (ds)
May 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by James Grandberry (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against SL Harbour Village, LLC by James Grandberry. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3107297) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discrimination complaint with Wisconsin ERD, #2 Exhibit B - Retaliation Complaint with Wisconsin ERD, #3 Exhibit C - Right to Sue Letter from EEOC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandberry v. SL Harbour Village, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL Harbour Village, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A Odian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grandberry
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?